This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/17/2020 at 19:21:54 (UTC).

Courville v. Life Insurance Co of North America et al

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Courville filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Life Insurance Co of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Carol B Whitehurst and Robert R Summerhays. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01133

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Carol B Whitehurst

Presiding Judge

Robert R Summerhays

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jerry Courville

Defendants

Schlumberger Technology Corporation

Life Insurance Company of North America

Schlumberger Technology Corp

Life Insurance Co of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lucas Scott Colligan

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2069

Lafayette, LA 70502-2069

Jacob Houston Hargett

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2069

Lafayette, LA 70502-2069

Joseph Frazier Gaar, Jr

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2069

Lafayette, LA 70502-2069

Jason M Welborn

Attorney at Law Office of Joseph F Gaar Jr

P O Box 2069

Lafayette, LA 70502-2069

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin

Attorney at Baker Botts (HOU)

910 Louisiana St 37Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Michael B Bennett

Attorney at Baker Botts (HOU)

910 Louisiana St 37Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002-4995

Matthew G Sheridan

Attorney at Baker Botts (HOU)

910 Louisiana St 37Th Fl

Houston, TX 77002-4995

 

Court Documents

#45

#44

#43

#42

#41

#40

39 #1

Proposed order

#39

#38

#7

#6

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Summons - Schlumberger Technology Corporation

1 #2

Summons - Life Insurance Company of North America

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) JUDGMENT...The Court has entered its Reasons for Decision. For those reasons, granting #39 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law.. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 11/8/2019. (crt,Jordan, P) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) REASONS FOR DECISION re #39 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record filed by Schlumberger Technology Corp, Life Insurance Co of North America. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 11/8/2019. (crt,Jordan, P) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record filed by Life Insurance Co of North America, Schlumberger Technology Corp. (aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record filed by Jerry Courville. (aty,Colligan, Lucas) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) RESPONSE in Opposition to Plaintiff's Statement of the Case by Life Insurance Co of North America, Schlumberger Technology Corp re #38 Response (NOT Motions) . (aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #39 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record. Motions referred to Judge Robert R Summerhays. (crt,Dauterive, C) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law on the Administrative Record and Brief in Support Thereof by Life Insurance Co of North America, Schlumberger Technology Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE Statement of the Case by Jerry Courville . (aty,Colligan, Lucas) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) JOINT STIPULATION re #16 ERISA Case Order by Jerry Courville, Life Insurance Co of North America, Schlumberger Technology Corp. (aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) Modified on 5/31/2019 to add filer (Williams, L). (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension Deadlines. Dispositive Motions due by 5/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 3/27/2019. (crt,Alexander, E) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Matthew G. Sheridan to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3783752) by Schlumberger Technology Corp. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Michael B. Bennett to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Admission fee: $105, receipt number 0536-3783367) by Schlumberger Technology Corp. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of good standing, #2 Proposed order)(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Schlumberger Technology Corp identifying Corporate Parent Schlumberger Holdings Corp, Corporate Parent Schlumberger BV, Corporate Parent Schlumberger Limited for Schlumberger Technology Corp. (aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Schlumberger Technology Corp.(Attorney Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin added to party Schlumberger Technology Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Gonsoulin, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY issued by the Clerk. Case reassigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays. Unassigned District Judge no longer assigned to case. All deadlines and hearings remain as set pending further review by the court. All future filings should bear the name of the new judge assignment. Approved by Chief Judge S Maurice Hicks, Jr on 9/26/2018. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Courville. Schlumberger Technology Corp served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aty,Colligan, Lucas) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Courville. Life Insurance Co of North America served on 9/18/2018, answer due 10/9/2018. (aty,Colligan, Lucas) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Co of North America, Schlumberger Technology Corp (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Reeves, T) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Co of North America, Schlumberger Technology Corp (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3741381) filed by Jerry Courville. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Summons - Life Insurance Company of North America, #3 Summons - Schlumberger Technology Corporation)(Attorney Lucas Scott Colligan added to party Jerry Courville(pty:pla))(aty,Colligan, Lucas) Modified on 8/31/2018 to edit text to reflect complaint against defendants and replace pdf of Attachment 1 with non-fillable form (Reeves, T). (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Schlumberger Technology Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Life Insurance Company of North America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael B Bennett

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Eric Gonsoulin