This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/15/2020 at 18:07:07 (UTC).

County of Morris v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 County of Morris filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-OP-45086

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

County of Morris

Defendants

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Does 1-100, Inclusive

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Abbott Laboratories, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Allergan Finance LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

9 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amy M. Carter

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier Bartlett

3232 Mckinney Avenue

Dallas, TX 75204

John F Walker

Attorney at Martin Walker PC

121 N Spring Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Jeffrey Blake Simon

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier Bartlett PC

3232 Mckinney Ave, Suite 610

Dallas, TX 75204

Reid William Martin

Attorney at Martin Walker PC

121 N Spring Avenue

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen Edward McConnico

Attorney at Scott Douglass & McConnico

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400, Austin,

Austin,, TX 78701

Noelle Marie Reed

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 6800

Houston, TX 77002

Alper T Ertas

Attorney at Venable LLP - San Francisco

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 1400

San Francisco, CA 94111

James K. O'Connor

Attorney at Venable LLP - Baltimore

750 East Pratt Street, Suite 900

Baltimore, MD 21202

John A. McCauley

Attorney at Venable - Baltimore

750 Pratt Street

Baltimore, MD 21202

Robert Philip Scott

Attorney at Blank Rome LLP - Houston

717 Texas Avenue, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77002-2727

Nicholas Alex Sarokhanian

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP - Dallas

200 Crescent Court, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75201

Craig Andrew Stanfield

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP - Houston

1000 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Christopher Scott Geyer

Attorney at Williams & Connolly LLP - Washington

725 Twelfth Street, N. W.

Washington, DC 20005-5901

Hannah DeMarco Sibiski

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 4000

Houston, TX 77002

Jack Wesley Hill

Attorney at Ward & Smith

111 West Tyler Street, P.O. Box 1231

Longview, TX 75606-1231

Other Attorneys

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

John Laurens Wilkes

Attorney at Jones Day - Houston

717 Texas, Suite 3300

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

50 #1

*Restricted*

#50

#49

#48

#47

#46

2 #18

Summons(es)

2 #17

Summons(es)

2 #16

Summons(es)

2 #14

Summons(es)

2 #13

Summons(es)

2 #4

Summons(es)

2 #3

Summons(es)

2 #2

Summons(es)

2 #1

Summons(es)

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Eastern. Case number 2:17-cv-00725. Electronic file and copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DocketInterdistrict transfer to the Northern District of Ohio. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by John A McCauley on behalf of Abbott Laboratories Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6579652. (McCauley, John) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by James K. O'Connor on behalf of Abbott Laboratories Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-6579523. (O'Connor, James) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Insys Therapeutics, Inc. to 1/18/2018. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re INSYS Therapeutics, Inc.(Sarokhanian, Nicholas) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Cephalon Inc. to 1/4/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. to 1/4/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is GRANTED pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Watson Laboratories, Inc. to 1/3/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( slo, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 12/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for McKesson Corporation to 1/4/2018. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( sm, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re McKesson Corporation.( Scott, Robert) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re McKesson Corporation.( Scott, Robert) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Rodney Gilstrap recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 11/6/2017. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reid William Martin on behalf of County of Morris (Martin, Reid) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John F Walker on behalf of County of Morris (Walker, John) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Abbott Laboratories Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons(es), #2 Summons(es), #3 Summons(es), #4 Summons(es), #5 Summons(es), #6 Summons(es), #7 Summons(es), #8 Summons(es), #9 Summons(es), #10 Summons(es), #11 Summons(es), #12 Summons(es), #13 Summons(es), #14 Summons(es), #15 Summons(es), #16 Summons(es), #17 Summons(es), #18 Summons(es))(ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6538572.), filed by County of Morris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Simon, Jeffrey) [Transferred from txed on 12/15/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allergan Finance LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant