Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 18:22:58 (UTC).

County of McLennan v. Purdue Pharma, L.P. et. al.

Case Summary

On 12/15/2017 County of McLennan filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Purdue Pharma, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-OP-45075

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster(MDL2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Abbott Laboratories

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Does 1-100, Inclusive

Purdue Pharma L.P.

McKesson Corporation

Pfizer Inc

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

The Purdue Frederick Company

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Ortho-Mcneil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Zollie Carlton Steakley

Attorney at Harrison Davis Steakley Morrison, PC

P.O. Box 21387

Waco, TX 76702

Herbert S. Bristow

Attorney at Haley & Olson, P.C.

510 North Valley Mills Drive, Suite 600

Waco, TX 76710

Stephen E. Harrison, II

Attorney at Harrison Davis Steakley Morrison

5 Ritchie Road

Waco, TX 76712

Brandon Rhodes Oates

Attorney at Haley & Olson, P.C.

Po Box 21147

Waco, TX 76702

Benjamin David Evans

Attorney at Haley & Olson P.C.

100 Ritchie Road, Suite 200

Waco, TX 76712

Matthew J. Morrison

Attorney at McGuire Woods - Charlotte

201 North Tryon Street

Charlotte, NC 28202

Gene M. (Zona) Jones

Attorney at Harrison Davis Steakley Morrison Jones, PC

850 Park Street

Beaumont, TX 77701

Stephen Bryan Harrison

Attorney at Harrison Davis Steakley Morris Jones, PC

P.O. Box 21387

Waco, TX 76702

Craig D. Cherry

Attorney at Haley & Olson

510 North Valley Mills Drive

Waco, TX 76710

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

#25

(#25) Summons Issued as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#24

(#24) Summons Issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#23

(#23) Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#22

(#22) Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, L.P. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#21

(#21) Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#20

(#20) Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#19

(#19) Summons Issued as to Knoll Pharmaceutical Company. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by County of McLennan (Morrison, Matthew) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

#6

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

4 #1

Proposed Order Pro Hac

#4

(#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

3 #1

Proposed Order Pro Hac

#3

(#5) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

#2

(#2) Letter sent to attorney Zona Jones and Bryan Harrison advising of attorney admission status and admission procedures. (jgb) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10130489). No Summons requested at this time, filed by McLennan County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cherry, Craig) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCase transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • DocketCASE NO LONGER REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Summons Issued as to Watson Laboratories, Inc. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Summons Issued as to The Purdue Frederick Company. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) Summons Issued as to Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, L.P. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Summons Issued as to Purdue Pharma, Inc. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Summons Issued as to Knoll Pharmaceutical Company. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by County of McLennan. (Cherry, Craig) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by County of McLennan (Morrison, Matthew) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jch) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J. Morrison (Bryan Harrison) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10146992) by on behalf of County of McLennan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Morrison, Matthew) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew J. Morrison (Zona Jones) ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-10146033) by on behalf of County of McLennan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Pro Hac). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Morrison, Matthew) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Letter sent to attorney Zona Jones and Bryan Harrison advising of attorney admission status and admission procedures. (jgb) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (jgb) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jgb) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-10130489). No Summons requested at this time, filed by McLennan County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Cherry, Craig) [Transferred from txwd on 12/18/2017.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant