This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/04/2022 at 06:41:33 (UTC).

County of Harris v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 County of Harris filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-45677

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

Arun Sharma

Abbott Laboratories

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.

Allergan Sales, LLC

Purdue Pharma L.P.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Richard Arthur Evans

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Cardinal Health 200, LLC

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Allergan PLC

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Interested Party

Illinois Union Insurance Company

48 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Charles C. Lifland

Stephen E. McConnico

Andrea Leigh Fair

Noelle M. Reed

Mark H. Lynch

Marquel Sautural Jordan

Andrew J. O'Connor

Michael W. Mengis

Jack Wesley Hill

Other Attorneys

Maria Wyckoff Boyce

Brian P. Johnson

Tracey B. Davies

Paul L. Creech

Charles Stanton Perry

Erin E. Lunceford

Stephanie K. McGuire

Hannah DeMarco Sibiski

25 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#118

(#118) Remand Order - Case remanded to the state court in Texas from which it was removed. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/30/22. (P,R) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

#117

(#117) Attorney Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by Michael C. McCutcheon filed on behalf of ICU Medical Sales Inc. (P,R) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#116

#115

114 #16

Exhibit Exhibit O

114 #15

Exhibit Exhibit N

114 #14

Exhibit Exhibit M

114 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

114 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

1 #8

Exhibit 3

1 #7

Exhibit 2

1 #6

Exhibit 1

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

178 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

03/30/2022

DocketCertified copy of remand order and docket sheet mailed to the 133rd District Court of Harris County, TX. (P,R) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/30/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#118) Remand Order - Case remanded to the state court in Texas from which it was removed. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/30/22. (P,R) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/26/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#117) Attorney Appearance and Substitution of Counsel by Michael C. McCutcheon filed on behalf of ICU Medical Sales Inc. (P,R) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2021
View Court Documents

Docket(#116) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to ICU Medical, Inc. ONLY filed by County of Harris. (Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/24/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#115) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Brandon Egan Caire and adding attorney Courtney E. Giles for ICU Medical Sales Inc. (P,R) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/08/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder [non-document] denying Plaintiffs' Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML(Related Doc #114 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 4/8/209.(P,R) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/27/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#114) Motion for leave to File Motion Seeking Suggestion of Remand to the JPML filed by Plaintiff County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Pleading Rule 10 Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/07/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#113) Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2019
View Court Documents

Docket(#112) Notice with attached Notice to Client by Don E. Lewis to withdraw as attorney field on behalf of Defendant Gazelle Craig. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(B,R) Modified on 2/27/2020 (P,R). (Entered: 04/10/2019)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#111) Objection to Filing Responses to the government Plaintiff Fact Sheet filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support Memorandum in Support of Objections to filing responses to the government plaintiff fact sheet) (Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
101 More Docket Entries
02/22/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#10) RESPONSE to #6 Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#9) SUPPLEMENT to #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time - Manufacturer Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., filed.(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time - Manufacturer Defendants' Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. a wholly-owned subsidiary of Endo Health Solutions Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sibiski, Hannah) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/22/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) RESPONSE in Opposition to #5 Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint under Rule 12, filed by County of Harris. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/22/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) Opposed MOTION to Stay Pending Ruling By United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/21/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) Opposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint under Rule 12 by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 200 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 3/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/21/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/21/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ckrus, 4) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/21/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand re: #2 MOTION to Remand by County of Harris, filed.(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION to Remand by County of Harris, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gallagher, Michael) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/20/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/16/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 133 District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2017-82618 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19619838) filed by Cardinal Health 110 LLC, Cardinal Health 414 LLC, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cardinal Health 200 LLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., McKesson Corporation, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Perry, Charles) [Transferred from txsd on 6/7/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less