Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2018 at 07:45:48 (UTC).

Countryside Bank v. Naseer et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2018 Countryside Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Naseer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James T Moody and John E Martin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James T Moody

Referral Judge

John E Martin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Countryside Bank

Defendants

Bushra Naseer

M.R. Allah LLC

Zafar Sheikh

Naser Musleh

3232 Central Avenue LLC

Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc

Wilshire Bank

Hasan Musleh

Non-Record Claimants

Bashir Chaudry

Central Market of Indiana Inc

Sean Z Sheikh Jr

Unknown Owners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nancy J Townsend

Attorney at Burke Costanza & Carberry LLP - Mer/IN

9191 Broadway

Merrillville, IN 46410

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Habib

77 W Washington Street 1506

Chicago, IL 60602

Robert A Habib PHV

Attorney at Law Office of Robert Habib

77 W Washington St Ste 1506

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Exhibit Affidavits

#19

(#19) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sean Z Sheikh Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits)(Habib PHV, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#18

(#18) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Countryside Bank to #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal . (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

#17

(#17) **FILING ERROR - THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REFILED AT DE #18 ** RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal filed by Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (ksc). (Entered: 11/12/2018)

16 #1

Exhibit Transcript

#16

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal filed by Sean Z Sheikh Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript)(Habib PHV, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

15 #8

Exhibit B6

15 #7

Exhibit B5

15 #6

Exhibit B4

#14

(#14) MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal by Plaintiff Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

5 #7

Exhibit 7

5 #6

Exhibit 6

5 #5

Exhibit 5

5 #4

Exhibit 4

5 #3

Exhibit 3

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#5) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Countryside Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sean Z Sheikh Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavits)(Habib PHV, Robert) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR REMAND FOR LACK OF JURISDICTION by Countryside Bank to #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal . (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) **FILING ERROR - THIS DOCUMENT HAS BEEN REFILED AT DE #18 ** RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal filed by Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) Modified on 11/14/2018 (ksc). (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal filed by Sean Z Sheikh Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript)(Habib PHV, Robert) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal filed by Countryside Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit B1, #4 Exhibit B2, #5 Exhibit B3, #6 Exhibit B4, #7 Exhibit B5, #8 Exhibit B6, #9 Errata B7, #10 Exhibit B8, #11 Exhibit B9, #12 Exhibit B10, #13 Exhibit B11)(Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Remand to State Court and for Costs and Expenses caused by Improper Removal by Plaintiff Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STATUS REPORT by Countryside Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track).. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/14/2018. (smb) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert A Habib PHV for Sean Sheikh. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/24/2018. (mtr) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) HEARING held on 10/24/2018 re Application for Attorney Robert Habib to Appear Pro Hac Vice before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Pla appeared by atty Nancy Townsend. Dft appeared by atty Robert Habib. Comments presented. Attorney Habib's Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice to be granted by separate order. Defendant Sean Z. Sheikh Jr's Response to #5 Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment to be filed by 11/14/2018. Plaintiff's Reply, if any, to be filed by 11/28/2018. Upon inquiry from the Court, Plaintiff represents that all unrepresented defendants' claims were resolved by judgment(s) entered in state court. Plaintiff's Status Report regarding status/proof of service as to all unrepresented defendants to be filed by 10/31/2018. Counsel for Pla confirms the only remaining claim in this case is against Sean Z. Sheikh, Jr. (#FTR.) cc: Attorney Robert Habib via email robhabib77@gmail.com(smb) Modified on 10/24/2018 to correct reply date for sj brief (smb). (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER Before the court is defendant Zafar Sheikh's #8 Motion to Question the Inflated Costs Assessed, or in the Alternative Expand the Time to File an Appeal. While Sheikh filed this motion in this case and in case 2:18-cv-132, it is clear that the motion should only have been filed in the latter. Accordingly, the court STRIKES Sheikhs motion #8 as inadvertently filed. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 10/11/18. (Copy certified mailed to pro se party)(kjp) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STRICKEN per #9 court order - MOTION to question the inflated costs assessed, or in the alternative to Extend of Time to File an Appeal, by Defendant Zafar Sheikh. (kjp) Modified on 10/12/2018 (kjp) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER re #3 APPLICATION for Attorney Robert Habib to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bushra Naseer, Sean Z Sheikh, Central Market of Indiana Inc, 3232 Central Avenue LLC, Hasan Musleh, M.R. Allah LLC, Zafar Sheikh, Bashir Chaudry, Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc. Hearing to be held on 10/24/2018 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Attorney Robert Habib is ORDERED to be present. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/4/2018. (cc: atty Robert Habib)(smb) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Countryside Bank. (Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Countryside Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Townsend, Nancy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Sean Z Sheikh J (rmf) Modified on 9/18/2018 (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION for Attorney Robert Habib to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Sean Z Sheikh Jr; Receipt #2016904. (rmf) Modified on 9/17/2018 (rmf). Modified to correct party name on 9/21/2018 (ksc). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sean Z Sheikh Jr (Filing fee $ 400 - Receipt #2016903), from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D02-1712-MF-00218, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Letter, #3 State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit A-B, #5 Envelope) Modified on 9/18/2018 (rmf) Modified on 9/18/2018 (rmf). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against 3232 Central Avenue LLC, Associated Wholesale Grocers Inc, Central Market of Indiana Inc, Bashir Chaudry, M.R. Allah LLC, Hasan Musleh, Naser Musleh, Bushra Naseer, Non-Record Claimants, Sean Z Sheikh Jr, Zafar Sheikh, Unknown Owners, Wilshire Bank, filed by Countryside Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B)(rmf) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WILSHIRE STATE BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where ASSOCIATED WHOLESALE GROCERS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Bank, N.A. is a litigant