This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2018 at 07:41:00 (UTC).

Coulter v. Knipp

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Coulter filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Knipp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steven P. Shreder. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven P. Shreder

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffanie Coulter

Defendant

Andrew Knipp

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James E. Dunn

Attorney at James Dunn & Associates, PLLC

1215 Classen Dr, Ste 200

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley E. Bowlby

Attorney at Starr Begin & King, PLLC

1515 S Tulsa Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

Christopher C. King

Attorney at Starr Begin & King, PLLC

1515 S Tulsa Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

 

Court Documents

#15

#14

#13

#12

11 #2

Defendant's Consent Form

11 #1

Plaintiff's Consent Form

#11

10 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Notice of Removal

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

#2

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: Settlement Conference set for 5/1/2019 at 9:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. (Settlement Conference Statements are due 4/17/2019)(sjr, Chambers) Modified text on 9/13/2018 (cjt, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting scheduling order dates: Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2018; Joinder of Parties due by 9/28/2018; Witness List due by 1/29/2019; Plaintiff's Expert Reports due by 3/1/2019; Exhibit List due by 3/29/2019; Defendant's Expert Reports due by 4/1/2019; Discovery due by 4/29/2019; Dispositive Motions due by 5/13/2019; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/31/2019; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/31/2019; Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2019 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder; Jury Trial set for 6/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. The Scheduling Conference set for 9/14/2018 at 10:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder is hereby STRICKEN. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Andrew Knipp (King, Christopher) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder setting Scheduling Conference for 9/14/2018 at 10:45 a.m. in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Parties directed to file Joint Status Report by 9/10/2018. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments) (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CERTIFICATE of State Court Clerk by Andrew Knipp (With attachments)(Bowlby, Bradley) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by James E. Dunn on behalf of Tiffanie Coulter (Dunn, James) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Andrew Knipp (King, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher C. King on behalf of Andrew Knipp (King, Christopher) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/13/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1198254 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Andrew Knipp (Bowlby, Bradley) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) JURY DEMAND by Andrew Knipp (Bowlby, Bradley) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley E. Bowlby on behalf of Andrew Knipp (Bowlby, Bradley) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Bradley E. Bowlby on behalf of Andrew Knipp (Bowlby, Bradley) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 8/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Bryan County District Court, case number 18-CJ-106 by Andrew Knipp (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Andrew Knipp (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Andrew Knipp by Tiffanie Coulter (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James E. Dunn