This case was last updated from PACER on 03/10/2018 at 07:03:23 (UTC).

Cosmetic Warriors Limited v. Lush Design Studio LLC

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 Cosmetic Warriors Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Lush Design Studio LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00046

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Cosmetic Warriors Limited

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Lush Design Studio LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Tracy Allen Marion

Attorney at LANIER FORD SHAVER & PAYNE, PC

2101 West Clinton Avenue Suite 102, P.O. Box 2087

Huntsville, AL 35805

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Thomas Samuel Duck

Attorney at WEBSTER HENRY LYONS WHITE BRADWELL & BLACK PC

Two Perimeter Park South, Suite 445E

Birmingham, AL 35243

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. Lush Design Studio LLC served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018. (Marion, Tracy) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#8

(#8) Lush Design Studio LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Cosmetic Warriors Limited by Lush Design Studio LLC.(Duck, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Lush Design Studio LLC, filed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(KBB) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Cosmetic Warriors Limited as to Lush Design Studio LLC. (Marion, Tracy) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

#6

(#6) Alias Summons Issued as to Lush Design Studio LLC, given to plaintiff for service. (KBB) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#5

(#5) Alias Summons Issued as to Lush Design Studio LLC, given to Plaintiff for service. (KBB) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#10

(#10) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDNGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 2/28/2018. (KSS) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Cosmetic Warriors Limited (KBB) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lush Design Studio LLC., given to Plaintiff for service. (KBB) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #2

Exhibit B

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDNGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 2/28/2018. (KSS) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/27/2018; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/21/2019 at 9:00 AM; Jury Trial set for 9/23/2019 at 9:00 AM; BOTH at the US Post Office & Courthouse, Decatur, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon.Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 2/27/2018. (KBB) (Entered: 02/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Lush Design Studio LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Cosmetic Warriors Limited by Lush Design Studio LLC.(Duck, Thomas) (Entered: 02/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. Lush Design Studio LLC served on 2/6/2018, answer due 2/27/2018. (Marion, Tracy) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Alias Summons Issued as to Lush Design Studio LLC, given to plaintiff for service. (KBB) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Alias Summons Issued as to Lush Design Studio LLC, given to Plaintiff for service. (KBB) (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Cosmetic Warriors Limited as to Lush Design Studio LLC. (Marion, Tracy) (Entered: 01/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Lush Design Studio LLC., given to Plaintiff for service. (KBB) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • Filing fee received from Lanier Ford in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number H4601003367. (KBB) (Entered: 01/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Cosmetic Warriors Limited (KBB) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Lush Design Studio LLC, filed by Cosmetic Warriors Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(KBB) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.