This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2018 at 07:01:43 (UTC).

Corus Realty Holdings, Inc v. Zillow Group, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2018 Corus Realty Holdings, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Zillow Group, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is James L. Robart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00847

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James L. Robart

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

CORUS REALTY HOLDINGS, INC.

Corus Realty Holdings, Inc

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Zillow, Inc.

Zillow Group, Inc

Trulia, LLC

Zillow, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Dario A Machleidt

Attorney at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP (WA)

1420 Fifth Avenue, Ste 3700

Seattle, WA 98101

Charles A Pannell, III

Attorney at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP (GA)

1100 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

Mitchell G. Stockwell

Attorney at KILPATRICK TOWNSEND & STOCKTON LLP (GA)

1100 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2800

Atlanta, GA 30309-4530

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Ramsey M Al-Salam

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

Antoine M McNamara

Attorney at PERKINS COIE (SEA)

1201 3Rd Ave, Ste 4900

Seattle, WA 98101-3099

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

6 #2

Summons Trulia Inc

6 #1

Summons Zillow Inc

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. Joint Status Report due by 9/7/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 8/17/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/31/2018. (AD) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Corus Realty Holdings, Inc by Trulia, LLC, Zillow, Inc, Zillow Group, Inc.(Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Antoine M McNamara on behalf of Defendants Trulia, LLC, Zillow Group, Inc, Zillow, Inc. (McNamara, Antoine) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ramsey M Al-Salam on behalf of Defendants Trulia, LLC, Zillow Group, Inc, Zillow, Inc. (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 06/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTE: Documents #14 Stip & Proposed Order, #15 Corporate Disclosure Statement were filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Ramsey M. Al-Salam is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Per, LCR 83.2, Mr. Al-Salam must file an appearance document. (PM) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Zillow Group, Inc. for Trulia, LLC, Zillow, Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Trulia, LLC, Zillow Group, Inc, Zillow, Inc (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Time to Answer Complaint by parties (Al-Salam, Ramsey) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER re #11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mitchell G. Stockwell for Defendant Corus Realty Holdings, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER re #10 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Charles A Pannell, III for Plaintiff Corus Realty Holdings, Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mitchell G. Stockwell FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Corus Realty Holdings, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5365669 (Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Trulia, LLC on 6/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Corus Realty Holdings, Inc. (Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Zillow, Inc. on 6/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Corus Realty Holdings, Inc. (Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Zillow Group, Inc. on 6/12/2018, filed by Plaintiff Corus Realty Holdings, Inc. (Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to All Defendants. (Main document - Summons Zillow Group, Inc) (Attachments: #1 Summons Zillow, Inc #2 Summons Trulia, LLC)(CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Judge James L. Robart added. (CDA) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION REGARDING A PATENT by Plaintiff CORUS REALTY HOLDINGS, INC. (Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by CORUS REALTY HOLDINGS, INC. (Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff CORUS REALTY HOLDINGS, INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5352125) Attorney Dario A Machleidt added to party CORUS REALTY HOLDINGS, INC.(pty:pla), filed by CORUS REALTY HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Machleidt, Dario) (Entered: 06/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRULIA INC, is a litigant

Latest cases where Zillow Group Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dario Alexander Machleidt Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchell G. Stockwell