This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2019 at 07:37:32 (UTC).

CORMICAN v. MORRIS et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2018 CORMICAN filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against MORRIS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dudley H. Bowen and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00081

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dudley H. Bowen

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JAMES ELIAS CORMILYN

Wrightsville, GA 31096

James Elias Cormican

Wrightsville, GA 31096

Defendants

MITZI HALL DON

DeAnn Morris

Lt. Franklin

Mitzi Hall

Deputy Warden Franklin

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the Court within 14 days of the date of this Order of his intentions regarding this case by complying with the Court's Order directing payment of initial filing fee of $77.00 or by showing the Court why he has not complied with the Order directing payment. (maa) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James Elias Cormican. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $77.00 within thirty days from the date of this Order. Compliance due by 12/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/29/2018. (maa) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#11

(#11) CONSENT by Prisoner James Elias Cormican to collection of fees. (maa) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2018. (maa) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Transfer. (pts) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

7 #1

*Restricted*

#7

(#7) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:18-cv-00370. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#6

(#6) AMENDED ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/6/2018. (chc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/5/2018. (chc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#4

(#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAMES ELIAS CORMILYN (vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JAMES ELIAS CORMILYN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against MITZI HALL DON, FRANKLIN, DEANN MORRIS,filed by JAMES ELIAS CORMILYN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 1/17/2019. (maa) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER directing Plaintiff to inform the Court within 14 days of the date of this Order of his intentions regarding this case by complying with the Court's Order directing payment of initial filing fee of $77.00 or by showing the Court why he has not complied with the Order directing payment. (maa) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of James Elias Cormican. The Court orders Plaintiff to pay an initial filing fee of $77.00 within thirty days from the date of this Order. Compliance due by 12/29/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/29/2018. (maa) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT by Prisoner James Elias Cormican to collection of fees. (maa) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by James Elias Cormican. (maa) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 11/07/2018. (maa) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Transfer. (pts) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #2 (pts) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 5:18-cv-00370. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Southern Georgia, Dublin Division. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 11/20/2018.) (vs) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #6 Order of Transfer I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #6 Order of Transfer including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (vs) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/6/2018. (chc) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia, Dublin Division. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE TILMAN E SELF, III on 11/5/2018. (chc) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S PROOF OF SERVICE for document #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #4 Consent to Proceed Form Sent I certify that on this date I have mailed by United States Postal Service a copy of #3 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #4 Consent to Proceed Form Sent including any attachments filed with this document to all non CM/ECF participants as indicated on the Notice of Electronic Filing. (vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to JAMES ELIAS CORMILYN (vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge issued at the direction of the Court. (vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Filed by JAMES ELIAS CORMILYN.. Motion(s) referred to THOMAS Q LANGSTAFF.(vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against MITZI HALL DON, FRANKLIN, DEANN MORRIS,filed by JAMES ELIAS CORMILYN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(vs) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less