This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2018 at 19:25:42 (UTC).

Corella v. AAA Demolition, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 Corella filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against AAA Demolition, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jill L. Burkhardt and Janis L. Sammartino. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00051

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jill L. Burkhardt

Presiding Judge

Janis L. Sammartino

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rafael Ruiz Corella

Defendants

Gary J. Goodemote

Raymundo Rodriguez

John J. Gotejen

American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc.

AAA Demolition, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew W Johnson

Attorney at Law Offices of Matthew W Johnson

2603 Main Street, 9Th Floor

Irvine, CA 92614

Marc S. Bragg

Attorney at Law Offices of Marc S. Bragg

3641 Kingsley Street

San Diego, CA 92106

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal and dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/2018. (mpl) (jao). (Entered: 04/23/2018)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez re #4 Non Opposition to Motion, (Rubino, Michael) (mpl). (Entered: 04/20/2018)

#4

(#4) NON Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice with leave to refile in appropriate forum filed by AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez. (Rubino, Michael) QC Mail re Missing Cert of Service. (mpl). (Entered: 04/19/2018)

3 #6

Proof of Service

3 #5

Declaration Marc S. Bragg

3 #4

Declaration Plaintiff Rafael Ruiz Corrella

3 #3

Exhibit Waivers of Service

3 #2

Exhibit Return of Service - AAA Demolition, Inc., and John Goetjen

3 #1

Memo of Points and Authorities

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice with leave to refile in appropriate forum by Rafael Ruiz Corella. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Return of Service - AAA Demolition, Inc., and John Goetjen, #3 Exhibit Waivers of Service, #4 Declaration Plaintiff Rafael Ruiz Corrella, #5 Declaration Marc S. Bragg, #6 Proof of Service)(Bragg, Marc)(mpl). (Entered: 02/22/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Granting #3 Unopposed Motion for Voluntary Dismissal and dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/20/2018. (mpl) (jao). (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez re #4 Non Opposition to Motion, (Rubino, Michael) (mpl). (Entered: 04/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NON Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice with leave to refile in appropriate forum filed by AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez. (Rubino, Michael) QC Mail re Missing Cert of Service. (mpl). (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction without prejudice with leave to refile in appropriate forum by Rafael Ruiz Corella. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit Return of Service - AAA Demolition, Inc., and John Goetjen, #3 Exhibit Waivers of Service, #4 Declaration Plaintiff Rafael Ruiz Corrella, #5 Declaration Marc S. Bragg, #6 Proof of Service)(Bragg, Marc)(mpl). (Entered: 02/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm) (jao). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against AAA Demolition, Inc., American Equipment and Demolition Services, Inc., Gary J. Goodemote, John J. Gotejen, Raymundo Rodriguez ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-10788801), filed by Rafael Ruiz Corella. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9)The new case number is 3:18-cv-00051-JLS-JLB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Bragg, Marc)(jrm) (jao). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.