This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 08:00:12 (UTC).

Corby v. Taylor et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Corby filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Taylor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Curtis L Collier and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00317

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Curtis L Collier

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Graff C Corby

Defendants

Steven Taylor

The City of Knoxville, Tennessee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan Jarrard

Attorney at Quist, Fitzpatrick & Jarrard, PLLC

800 S. Gay Street, 2121 First Tennessee Plaza

Knoxville, TN 37929-9711

Defendant Attorneys

E Jerome Melson

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore, PC

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37902

John M Kizer

Attorney at Gentry, Tipton & McLemore, PC

900 South Gay Street, Suite 2300

Knoxville, TN 37902

Ronald E Mills

Attorney at City of Knoxville

P O Box 1631

Knoxville, TN 37901

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Steven Taylor, The City of Knoxville, Tennessee (Melson, E) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

16 #1

Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent

#16

(#16) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on September 10, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Steven Taylor.(Melson, E) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to Complaint by The City of Knoxville, Tennessee.(Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION of Extension of Time by The City of Knoxville, Tennessee. (Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of The City of Knoxville, Tennessee (Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graff C Corby. Steven Taylor served on 8/10/2018. (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graff C Corby. The City of Knoxville, Tennessee served on 8/10/2018. (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#9

(#9) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#8

(#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#7

(#7) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#6

(#6) Administrative Notice to Counsel. No action to be taken. Informational only. For future reference, please do not enter the address information for the parties. Also, please file the Summons and Civil Cover Sheet in a flattened form. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

5 #1

Summons The City of Knoxville, Tennessee

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Steven Taylor, and The City of Knoxville, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Summons The City of Knoxville, Tennessee) (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Graff C Corby Civil Cover Sheet (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Graff C Corby Summons - City of Knoxville (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3733607.), filed by Graff C Corby.(Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Steven Taylor, The City of Knoxville, Tennessee (Melson, E) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on September 10, 2018. (Attachments: #1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent) (AYB) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Steven Taylor.(Melson, E) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ANSWER to Complaint by The City of Knoxville, Tennessee.(Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) STIPULATION of Extension of Time by The City of Knoxville, Tennessee. (Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of The City of Knoxville, Tennessee (Mills, Ronald) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graff C Corby. Steven Taylor served on 8/10/2018. (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graff C Corby. The City of Knoxville, Tennessee served on 8/10/2018. (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Administrative Notice to Counsel. No action to be taken. Informational only. For future reference, please do not enter the address information for the parties. Also, please file the Summons and Civil Cover Sheet in a flattened form. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Steven Taylor, and The City of Knoxville, Tennessee. (Attachments: #1 Summons The City of Knoxville, Tennessee) (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE by Graff C Corby Civil Cover Sheet (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Graff C Corby Summons - City of Knoxville (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Graff C Corby Summons - Steven Taylor (Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3733607.), filed by Graff C Corby.(Jarrard, Ryan) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less