This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2018 at 07:56:24 (UTC).

Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC et al v. KB Ag Corporation, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against KB Ag Corporation, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lawrence L. Piersol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-04127

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lawrence L. Piersol

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Copperhead Concave LLC

Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC

Defendants

Kimber Mitchell

KB Ag Corporation, LLC

Brian Robertson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brett A. Lovrien

Attorney at Cadwell, Sanford, Deibert & Garry, LLP

200 E 10Th Street, Suite 200, Po Box 2498, 336-0828, Fax: 336-6036

Sioux Falls, SD 57101-2498

Alex M. Hagen

Attorney at Cadwell, Sanford, Deibert & Garry, LLP

200 E 10Th Street, Suite 200

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) ORDER denying #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/13/2018. (SLT) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants filed by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants Affidavit of Peyton Hutchinson filed by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

6 #2

Exhibit B Return of Non Service

6 #1

Exhibit A SOS Printout

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants filed by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A SOS Printout, #2 Exhibit B Return of Non Service) (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to KB Ag Corporation, LLC, Kimber Mitchell, Brian Robertson. 3 original summons, 5 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Filing Fee Received from Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048131. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Copperhead Concave LLC, Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER denying #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 11/13/2018. (SLT) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants filed by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants Affidavit of Peyton Hutchinson filed by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #5 MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants filed by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A SOS Printout, #2 Exhibit B Return of Non Service) (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Order Permitting Substitute Service of Defendants by Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. (Hagen, Alex) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to KB Ag Corporation, LLC, Kimber Mitchell, Brian Robertson. 3 original summons, 5 A085s, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via hand-delivery to law office staff. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Filing Fee Received from Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC, Copperhead Concave LLC. Fee Amount: $400, Receipt No.: #SDX400048131. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Copperhead Concave LLC, Copperhead Agricultural Products, LLC. (SLW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.