This case was last updated from PACER on 11/10/2018 at 07:42:17 (UTC).

Copez v. Umukoro et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Copez filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Umukoro. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is James K. Bredar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02791

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James K. Bredar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marquis Copez

Baltimore, MD 21202

Defendants

Lawerence Umukoro

A. Fagbemi

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against A. Fagbemi, Lawerence Umukoro, filed by Marquis Copez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #2 Envelope) (ds3, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing Finance Officer to file within 21 days an inmate account summary information sheet. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/4/2018. (c/m 10/4/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

4 #1

Envelope

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Attachment

#4

(#4) Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Inmate Account Summary. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Marquis Copez ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/31/2018. (c/m 11/01/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to electronically send copy of Complaint and withhold service; DIRECTING counsel for defendants to notify court if service is accepted and to answer the Complaint ( re #1 Complaint filed by Marquis Copez ). Attachments will be emailed to attorneys who have not entered their appearance and were sent this NEF. Attorneys should contact the court if they do not receive the attachments; Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/31/2018. (c/m 11/01/2018 bas, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Inmate Account Summary. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing Finance Officer to file within 21 days an inmate account summary information sheet. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 10/4/2018. (c/m 10/4/2018)(ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marquis Copez(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against A. Fagbemi, Lawerence Umukoro, filed by Marquis Copez. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ds3, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2018: #2 Envelope) (ds3, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.