This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2018 at 09:46:29 (UTC).

COOPER v. COOK et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 COOPER filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against COOK. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ann Marie Donio and Jerome B. Simandle. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-01293

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ann Marie Donio

Presiding Judge

Jerome B. Simandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORRIS M. COOPER

Defendants

PHILIP G. PAGANO

H. WARNER

COHEN

R. WAGNER

AMELIA ESTRELLA RODRIGUEZ

JOSEPH E. KRAKORA

KEVIN WALKER

ARTIST

GINA Y. HOLMES

CHRISTOPHER SMITH

BILLIE J. MOORE

WILLINGBORO TOWNSHIP MUNICIPAL COURT

TERRENCE COOK

ATLANTIC COUNTY MUNICIPAL COURT

KENNETH S. DOMZALSKI

MICHAEL V. LUCIANO

ATLANTIC CITY POLICE DEPARTMENT

ATLANTIC COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT LAW DIVISION

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM and ORDER IFP is DENIED and Clerk shall administratively terminate this matter. ORDERED Clerk shall send Plaintiff a blank IFP and a copy of this Order. ORDERED Plaintiff has 30 days from the entry of this Order to reopen this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/23/2015. (nz, )n.m.

#7

(#7) OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 4/20/2015. (nz, )n.m.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 4/20/2015. (nz, )n.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM and ORDER IFP is DENIED and Clerk shall administratively terminate this matter. ORDERED Clerk shall send Plaintiff a blank IFP and a copy of this Order. ORDERED Plaintiff has 30 days from the entry of this Order to reopen this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 2/23/2015. (nz, )n.m.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.