This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 14:22:52 (UTC).

Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority v. Orchard Software Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Orchard Software Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr and Joe Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00075

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judge

Joe Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority

Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority doing business as Cookeville Regional Medical Center

Defendant

Orchard Software Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cynthia A. Wilson

Attorney at Madewell, Jared, Halfacre, Williams & Wilson

230 N Washington Avenue

Cookeville, TN 38501

Kenneth S. Williams

Attorney at Madewell, Jared, Halfacre, Williams & Wilson

230 N Washington Avenue

Cookeville, TN 38501

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Attachment Certified Mail Green Card returned by Registered Agent for Orchard So

#7

(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority. Orchard Software Corporation served on 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Mail Green Card returned by Registered Agent for Orchard Software Corp.)(Williams, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/28/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 01:00 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons issued as to Orchard Software Corporation. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #2

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Agreement between CRMC and Orchard

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Orchard Software Corporation (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2738842), filed by Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement between CRMC and Orchard, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS returned executed by Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority. Orchard Software Corporation served on 9/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certified Mail Green Card returned by Registered Agent for Orchard Software Corp.)(Williams, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01(d)(5). Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/28/2018. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2018 at 01:00 PM in Cookeville before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons issued as to Orchard Software Corporation. (Service copies returned to counsel by mail.) (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Cynthia A. Wilson, Kenneth S. Williams. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Orchard Software Corporation (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 0650-2738842), filed by Cookeville Regional Medical Center Authority. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement between CRMC and Orchard, #2 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet)(dt) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cookeville Regional Medical Center is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cynthia A. Wilson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth S. Williams