This case was last updated from PACER on 02/24/2019 at 07:21:38 (UTC).

Cook v. SAF-Holland, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2018 Cook filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against SAF-Holland, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie L. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02140

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie L. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tony Cook

St. Louis, MO 63144

Defendants

SAF-Holland, Inc.

4900 Main Street, Suite 650

Kansas City, MO 64112

Ms. Mary Brown

Kansas City, MO 64112

Mary C. Brown

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gregory E. Anderson

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GREGORY ANDERSON LLC

1420 Strassner Drive

St. Louis, MO 63144

Defendant Attorneys

James R. Holland, II

Attorney at FISHER AND PHILLIPS, LLP

4900 Main St., Suite 650

Kansas City, MO 64112

Joseph J. Vogan

Attorney at VARNUM AND RIDDERING

333 Bridge St., Nw, P.O. Box 352

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0352

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Rule 16 Conference (ECF No. #12 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously scheduled for February 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELED. If necessary, the Court will reschedule the Rule 16 Conference and order the parties to submit an amended joint proposed scheduling plan after it rules on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. #10 ). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/4/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#15

(#15) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. . (Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#14

(#14) ORAL MOTION Request for Oral Argument Re: Motion for Remand by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

13 #4

Exhibit D - Request for Leave of Absence

13 #3

Exhibit C - Termination Notice

13 #2

Exhibit B - Leave of Absence Guidelines

13 #1

Exhibit A - CBA

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit filed by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA, #2 Exhibit B - Leave of Absence Guidelines, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Request for Leave of Absence)(Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Rule 16 Order, Defendants and by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#11

(#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit filed by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#10

(#10) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#9

(#9) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Two Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/1/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/8/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/03/2019. (KCB) Modified on 1/3/2019 (KCB). (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc..(Holland, James) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph J. Vogan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6950802) by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Holland, James) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#4

(#4) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Petition (JWD) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

1 #7

Original Filing Form

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Stay Rule 16 Conference (ECF No. #12 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Rule 16 Conference, previously scheduled for February 8, 2019 at 10:00 a.m., is CANCELED. If necessary, the Court will reschedule the Rule 16 Conference and order the parties to submit an amended joint proposed scheduling plan after it rules on Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. #10 ). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/4/2019. (AFC) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. . (Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORAL MOTION Request for Oral Argument Re: Motion for Remand by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit filed by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CBA, #2 Exhibit B - Leave of Absence Guidelines, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Notice, #4 Exhibit D - Request for Leave of Absence)(Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint MOTION to Stay re #9 Rule 16 Order, Defendants and by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit filed by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of Warren County, Missouri, 12th Judicial Circuit by Plaintiff Tony Cook. (Anderson, Gregory) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RULE 16 ORDER This case is assigned to Track: Two Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/1/2019. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/8/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/03/2019. (KCB) Modified on 1/3/2019 (KCB). (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • (#8) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Joseph J. Vogan's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (ECF No. 6) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/2/19. (THL) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc..(Holland, James) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph J. Vogan. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-6950802) by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Vogan, Joseph) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Mary C. Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Holland, James) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. (JWD) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet re #1 Notice of Removal Petition (JWD) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant SAF-Holland, Inc.. Parent companies: SAF-HOLLAND gmbH, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (JWD) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Warren County Circuit Court, filed by Tony Cook. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MCHR Charging Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - MCHR Letter)(JWD)Clerk's note: Exhibit #1 sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers. (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 12th Judicial Circuit, case number 17BB-CC00056, with receipt number 0865-6944766, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Mary Brown, SAF-Holland, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Labor Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Leave of Absence Guidelines, #3 Exhibit C - Termination Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Request for Leave, #5 Exhibit E - Circuit Court Pleadings, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Original Filing Form, #8 Attachment Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate)(Holland, James) (Main Document 1 and Attachment 6 replaced on 12/27/2018 to correct PDF error) (JWD). Clerk's note: attachment #5 sealed pursuant to Local Rule 2.17 because it contains personal identifiers. (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less