This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2018 at 13:39:45 (UTC).

Controls Southeast, Inc. v. QMax Industries, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/10/2016 Controls Southeast, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against QMax Industries, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David S. Cayer. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:16-CV-00230

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Controls Southeast, Inc.

Defendants

Henry P. Gaines, Jr.

QMax Industries, Inc.

Thomas W. Perry

Peter E. Kobylarz, , Jr.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Mark Wilson

Benjamin E. Leace(Designation Retained)

Christopher H. Blaszkowski(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#72

(#72) ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew J. Koopman for Controls Southeast, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/17/18. (tob)

#62

(#62) ORDER Amending re 55 Order on Motion for Hearing. The Court amends its prior ruling in part (Doc. No. 55), and shortens the June 6, 2017, scheduled claim construction hearing to two (2) hours. Each side shall have thirty (30) minutes per disputed claim term to submit its evidence for a total of one (1) hour each.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/5/17. (clc)

#58

(#58) ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William B. Dyer, III for QMax Industries, Inc.; granting 57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew Strickland for QMax Industries, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/10/17. (tob)

#48

(#48) ORDER granting 36 Motion to Compel; granting 36 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part 39 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/30/17. (tob)

#34

(#34) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/19/17. (mga)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher H. Blaszkowski for Controls Southeast, Inc.; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Benjamin E. Leace for Controls Southeast, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/12/16. (tob)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#72) ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew J. Koopman for Controls Southeast, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/17/18. (tob)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#62) ORDER Amending re 55 Order on Motion for Hearing. The Court amends its prior ruling in part (Doc. No. 55), and shortens the June 6, 2017, scheduled claim construction hearing to two (2) hours. Each side shall have thirty (30) minutes per disputed claim term to submit its evidence for a total of one (1) hour each.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/5/17. (clc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#58) ORDER granting 56 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William B. Dyer, III for QMax Industries, Inc.; granting 57 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew Strickland for QMax Industries, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/10/17. (tob)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) ORDER granting 36 Motion to Compel; granting 36 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part 39 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/30/17. (tob)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/19/17. (mga)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher H. Blaszkowski for Controls Southeast, Inc.; granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Benjamin E. Leace for Controls Southeast, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/12/16. (tob)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENJAMIN E. LEACE(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher H. Blaszkowski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer J. Mark Wilson