This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:49:39 (UTC).

Continental Fire Sprinkler Company v. Elite Fire Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Continental Fire Sprinkler Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Elite Fire Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00088

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kelly Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Continental Fire Sprinkler Company

Defendants

Elite Fire Systems, Inc.

Rick Young

Chad Edberg

Elite Fire Systems, Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher R Hedican

Attorney at Baird Holm McEachen Pedersen Hamann & Strasheim

1500 Woodmen Tower, ***Ecf

Omaha, NE 68102

Defendant Attorneys

Vernon Pellett Squires

Attorney at Bradley & Riley PC

2007 1St Ave Se, Po Box 2804, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52404

Ryan S Fisher

Attorney at Bradley & Riley PC

2007 1St Ave Se, Po Box 2804, ***Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52404

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Elite Fire Systems, Inc (Squires, Vernon) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Elite Fire Systems, Inc, Chad Edberg, and Rick Young.(Squires, Vernon) Modified text on 9/18/2018 (mml). Modified text on 9/19/2018 (pac). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#4

(#4) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Continental Fire Sprinkler Company (Hedican, Christopher) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

3 #1

New Civil Case Packet

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/26/2018. (mml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2760529.), filed by Continental Fire Sprinkler Company. Scheduling Report due by 11/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hedican, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Elite Fire Systems, Inc (Squires, Vernon) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Set Deadline: Defendant Elite Fire Systems, Inc. LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 10/17/2018. (mml) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Elite Fire Systems, Inc, Chad Edberg, and Rick Young.(Squires, Vernon) Modified text on 9/18/2018 (mml). Modified text on 9/19/2018 (pac). (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Continental Fire Sprinkler Company (Hedican, Christopher) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Set Deadlines: Plaintiff LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 9/26/2018. (mml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Civil Case Packet) (mml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 9/26/2018. (mml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added. Clerk checked for conflicts; none found. (mml) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT With Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0862-2760529.), filed by Continental Fire Sprinkler Company. Scheduling Report due by 11/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Hedican, Christopher) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.