This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2019 at 07:10:40 (UTC).

Conning v. Halpern et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Conning filed an Other - Arbitration lawsuit against Halpern. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jennifer C. Boal and Allison D. Burroughs. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-12336

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Arbitration

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Jennifer C. Boal

Allison D. Burroughs

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Andrew Scott Conning

Defendants

Jack Halpern

CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nathaniel J. Lichtin

Attorney at Parker Keough LLLP

51 Winchester Street, Suite 205

Newton, MA 02461

Kenneth R. L. Parker

965 Walnut Street

Newton, MA 02461

Shaun P. Keough

Attorney at Parker Keough LLP

362 Lexingdale Drive

Orlando, FL 32828

Defendant Attorneys

Sean T. Carnathan

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

Tara J. Myslinski

Attorney at O'Connor, Carnathan and Mack LLC

1 Van De Graaff Drive, Suite 104

Burlington, MA 01803

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Scott Conning and Exhibits

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Scott Conning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Scott Conning and Exhibits)(Parker, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

#15

(#15) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Andrew Scott Conning. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Counsel in Support of Response to Show Cause Order)(Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

#12

(#12) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Tara J. Myslinski on behalf of CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern (Myslinski, Tara) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit A

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern of Special Appearance (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Andrew Scott Conning. Acknowledgement filed by Andrew Scott Conning. (Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#4

(#4) STATE COURT Record CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc. summons served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018; Jack Halpern summons served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018.. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7401701 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Andrew Scott Conning. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew Scott Conning and Exhibits)(Parker, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ELECTRONIC ENDORSEMENT APPROVING #15 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by Andrew Scott Conning (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Andrew Scott Conning. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Of Counsel in Support of Response to Show Cause Order)(Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Judge Allison D. Burroughs: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. On November 20, 2018, Defendants filed a motion to dismiss pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2). [ECF No. #8 ]. Plaintiff had 14 days to oppose the motion per Local Rule 7.1(b)(2). Plaintiff is hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to oppose the motion. Any opposition to the motion to dismiss must be filed by December 14, 2018, or the motion will be granted as unopposed.(McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • (#13) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Re-Assignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • (#11) ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (York, Steve) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Tara J. Myslinski on behalf of CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern (Myslinski, Tara) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern of Special Appearance (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Executed by Andrew Scott Conning. Acknowledgement filed by Andrew Scott Conning. (Lichtin, Nathaniel) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STATE COURT Record CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc. summons served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018; Jack Halpern summons served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018.. (Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#3) Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by mail (Jones, Sherry) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • (#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CJK Dictionary Institute, Inc., Jack Halpern ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7401701 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Category Form, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Carnathan, Sean) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth R. L. Parker