This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2018 at 06:11:03 (UTC).

Concannon et al v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/19/2018 Concannon filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against DePuy Orthopaedics Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Ed Kinkeade. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00146

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Peggy Concannon

Robert Concannon

Defendants

DOES 1-10, inclusive

DePuy Orthopaedics Inc

Johnson and Johnson Services Inc

Thomas P Schmalzried, MD

Special Master

Special Master

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristy M Arevalo

Attorney at McCune-Wright-Arevalo LLP

3281 East Guasti Road, Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Defendant Attorneys

Michael V Powell

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2800

Dallas, TX 75201-6776

David C Allen

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2904

Jessica D Miller

Attorney at Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

1440 New York Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Kelley S Olah

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Seth Michael Roberts

Attorney at Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell LLP

2200 Ross Avenue, Suite 2200

Dallas, TX 75204

Special Master Attorney

James M Stanton-2244

Attorney at Stanton LLP

1717 Main Street, Suite 3800

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

20 #1

*Restricted*

#20

(#20) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:17-cv-01318. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/19/2018)

#19

(#19) Conditional Transfer Order - 286 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 1/17/2018. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #11 by Judge George H. Wu. A status conference is set for August 3, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2017)

11 #1

Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings

#11

(#11) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/05/2017)

4 #8

Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #7

Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #6

Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #5

Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

4 #1

Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation. Transferred to Judge Wu (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #2 Part 2 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #3 Part 3 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #4 Part 4 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #5 Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #6 Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #7 Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #8 Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

#3

(#3) Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, identifying Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Synthes, Inc.. (Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

2 #1

Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action

1 #1

Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court of California, case number PSC1702015 Receipt No: 0973-20111652 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:17-cv-01318. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 01/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Conditional Transfer Order - 286 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 1/17/2018. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • (#18) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 01/18/2018 to 02/22/18 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • (#17) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 12/18/2017 to 01/18/2018 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • (#16) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 11/16/2017 to 12/18/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • (#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY - IN CHAMBERS by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 10/12/2017 to 11/16/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 10/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • (#14) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 09/07/2017 to 10/12/2017 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • (#13) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge George H. Wu: The Court CONTINUES the Status Conference previously set for 08/03/2017 to 09/07/17 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/20/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER RE STIPULATION TO STAY ALL PROCEEDINGS by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case, #11 by Judge George H. Wu. A status conference is set for August 3, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • (#8) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for August 3, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:17-cv-01318 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 16-05, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:17-cv-01318-TJH (FFMx). (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Does 1-10, inclusive, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc, Thomas P. Schmalzried, M.D. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Peggy Concannon, Robert Concannon. [FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/18/2017 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO EXHIBIT 2 TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AS ATTACHMENT #2] (et) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation. Transferred to Judge Wu (Attachments: #1 Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #2 Part 2 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #3 Part 3 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #4 Part 4 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #5 Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #6 Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #7 Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, #8 Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, identifying Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Synthes, Inc.. (Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet)(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court of California, case number PSC1702015 Receipt No: 0973-20111652 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation, DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, #2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action) (Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., a New Jersey Corporation (pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 1/19/2018.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristy Marie Arevalo