This case was last updated from PACER on 01/25/2019 at 07:24:11 (UTC).

Commo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Commo filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Vermont District. The Judge overseeing this case is John M. Conroy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00197

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Vermont District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John M. Conroy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lynn L. Commo

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phyllis E. Rubenstein, Esq.

26 State Street, Suite 1

Montpelier, VT 05602

Defendant Attorney

Jason P. Peck, SAUSA

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office

P.O. Box 570

Burlington, VT 05402-0570

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Peck, Jason) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #9 Certificate of Service filed by Lynn L. Commo. The docket entry has been clarified to indicated Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 12/13/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. (law) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed. Commissioner of Social Security Administration served on 12/13/2018, answer due 2/11/2019. by Lynn L. Commo. (Attachments: #1 Return Receipts)(Rubenstein, Phyllis) Text clarified on 12/28/2018 (law). (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT to Direct Assignment by Lynn L. Commo (Rubenstein, Phyllis) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason P. Peck, SAUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration.(Peck, Jason) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • ISSUED Summons as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration., ISSUED Local Rule 73 Forms. (eh) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Lynn L. Commo. (hbc) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 REVISED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; denying as moot #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 12/5/2018. (This is a text-only Order.) (hbc) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REVISED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lynn L. Commo. (eh) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • (#3) ORDER: On or before 12/17/2018, Plaintiff shall file a revised IFP Application wherein Plaintiff shall report the value of the real estate upon which Plaintiff reports a monthly mortgage obligation. See, Doc. 1-1, para. 5 and 6. Signed by Judge John M. Conroy on 11/27/2018. (This is a text-only Order) (eh) Text clarified on 11/28/2018 (hbc). (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re: #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lynn L. Commo. The JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced to update Sections IV and VIII. The revised document is now attached to #1 and this entry. (law) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Lynn L. Commo. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, #2 Proposed Complaint (image is sealed), #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (eh) (Attachment 3 replaced on 11/27/2018) (law). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.