This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/30/2018 at 07:31:00 (UTC).

Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association v. Eagle Contracting Services, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eagle Contracting Services, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda V. Parker and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-13412

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association

Defendants

Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.

Kurt A. Rillema

The Arriola Law Firm, L.L.C.

First Financial Bank, National Association

Eagle Contracting Services, L.L.C.

Miller & Law, P.C.

ECS, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David F. Wells

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

12/21/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. First Financial Bank, National Association waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/09/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Miller & Law, P.C. waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 12/09/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/29/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/01/2018

DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Comerica Incorporated for Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association. (Wells, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/31/2018
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Interpleader Relief filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6971837 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wells, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less