This case was last updated from PACER on 12/30/2018 at 07:31:00 (UTC).

Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association v. Eagle Contracting Services, L.L.C. et al

Case Summary

On 10/31/2018 Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Eagle Contracting Services, L L C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Linda V. Parker and David R. Grand. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-13412

  • Filing Date:

    10/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Linda V. Parker

Referral Judge

David R. Grand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association

Defendants

Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc.

Kurt A. Rillema

The Arriola Law Firm, L.L.C.

First Financial Bank, National Association

Eagle Contracting Services, L.L.C.

Miller & Law, P.C.

ECS, L.L.C.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David F. Wells

Attorney at Stancato Tragge Wells, PLLC

Two Towne Square, Suite 825

Southfield, MI 48076

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. First Financial Bank, National Association waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Interpleader Relief filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6971837 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wells, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Miller & Law, P.C. waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 12/09/2018)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Comerica Incorporated for Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association. (Wells, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. First Financial Bank, National Association waiver sent on 11/29/2018, answer due 1/28/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Miller & Law, P.C. waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 12/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Thompson Thrift Construction, Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Wells, David) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (LGra) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LGra) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by All Plaintiffs identifying Corporate Parent Comerica Incorporated for Comerica Bank, a Texas Banking Association. (Wells, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT For Interpleader Relief filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-6971837 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Out of State - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Wells, David) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.