This case was last updated from PACER on 12/02/2018 at 07:27:47 (UTC).

COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY v. ABOVE THE CUT RESTORATION, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2018 COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against ABOVE THE CUT RESTORATION, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Doris L. Pryor, Jane Magnus-Stinson and James Patrick Hanlon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03057

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

Presiding Judges

Jane Magnus-Stinson

James Patrick Hanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

ABOVE THE CUT RESTORATION LLC

ADAM HAYDEN

GENEVIEVE CARMANY

ABOVE THE CUT RESTORATION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Dennis F. Cantrell

Attorney at CANTRELL, STRENSKI & MEHRINGER, LLP

150 West Market Street, Suite 800

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Jeffrey A. Siderius

Attorney at CRAY HUBER HORSTMAN HEIL & VANAUSDAL LLC

202 W. Madison, Suite 2200

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorney

Scott A. Norrick

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW, P.C.

1010 W. 8Th Street, Suite 5

Anderson, IN 46016

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Order

#25

(#25) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to December 28, 2018 , filed by Defendant GENEVIEVE CARMANY. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Norrick, Scott) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#20

(#20) Submission of Proposed Order , re #14 MOTION to Refund Administrative Fee, #13 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Defendant GENEVIEVE CARMANY. (Norrick, Scott) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#24

(#24) ORDER granting #14 Motion to refund Administrative Fee to Scott A. Norrick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018 (dist to USDC Financial Department) (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#23

(#23) ORDER withdrawing #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice and granting #13 Motion to Withdraw #9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018. (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#14

(#24) ORDER granting #14 Motion to refund Administrative Fee to Scott A. Norrick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018 (dist to USDC Financial Department) (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#13

(#23) ORDER withdrawing #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice and granting #13 Motion to Withdraw #9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018. (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

9 #2

Envelope

#9

(#23) ORDER withdrawing #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice and granting #13 Motion to Withdraw #9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018. (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#5

(#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ABOVE THE CUT RESTORATION, LLC, GENEVIEVE CARMANY, ADAM HAYDEN. (HET) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY for COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Cantrell on behalf of Plaintiff COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #4

Proposed Summons

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Colony Insurance Policy

1 #1

Exhibit A - Underlying Lawsuit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5094138) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Colony Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to December 28, 2018 , filed by Defendant GENEVIEVE CARMANY. (Attachments: #1 Order)(Norrick, Scott) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Submission of Proposed Order , re #14 MOTION to Refund Administrative Fee, #13 MOTION to Withdraw Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by Defendant GENEVIEVE CARMANY. (Norrick, Scott) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ORDER granting #14 Motion to refund Administrative Fee to Scott A. Norrick. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018 (dist to USDC Financial Department) (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER withdrawing #9 Motion to Appear pro hac vice and granting #13 Motion to Withdraw #9 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018. (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER denying as moot #12 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018. (CBU) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2019 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a Proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 11/25/2018.(CBU) Modified on 11/27/2018 (CBU)(dist made) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER REGARDING THE PARTIES' STIPULATION - The Court has received the Stipulation of Colony Insurance Company, Above the Cut LLC, and Adam Hayden filed November 15, 2018. Dkt. #18 . Within thirty days of the date of this entry, counsel for Plaintiff shall file a motion requesting--with specificity--any actions that it believes the Court should take under the stipulation. The motion must also include the other parties' positions regarding each of those specific actions. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 11/20/2018.(DWH) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) STIPULATION , filed by Plaintiff COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GENEVIEVE CARMANY re #11 Notice of Appearance Amended Appearance (Norrick, Scott) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Reassignment of Case to Judge James Patrick Hanlon. Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number ( 1:18-cv-3057-JPH-DLP), which includes the initials of the newly assigned judge, on all future filings in this matter. (JDad) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time in which to Answer Complaint, filed by Defendant GENEVIEVE CARMANY (by pro hac vice counsel). (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(APD) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Attorney(s) Scott A. Norrick to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number IP062722), filed by Defendant GENEVIEVE CARMANY. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Envelope)(APD) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney Jeffrey A. Siderius for COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 10/19/2018 (dist made) (CBU) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Attorney(s) JEFFREY A. SIDERIUS to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0756-5106554), filed by Plaintiff COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Certification of Jeffrey A. Siderius, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROCEDURES AND PRACTICES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (APD) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to ABOVE THE CUT RESTORATION, LLC, GENEVIEVE CARMANY, ADAM HAYDEN. (HET) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY for COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY.. (Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis F. Cantrell on behalf of Plaintiff COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants, filed by COLONY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5094138) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Lawsuit, #2 Exhibit B - Colony Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Cantrell, Dennis) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.