This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/19/2018 at 07:41:47 (UTC).

COLON-MONCLOVA et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 COLON-MONCLOVA was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01699

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BETTY JAMES-ULMER

CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP COLON-JAMES

PEDRO COLON-MONCLOVA

Defendant

Universal Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan H. Saavedra-Castro

Attorney at Juan H. Saavedra Castro Law Office

Po Box 9021782

San Juan, PR 00902-1782

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Summons

#5

(#5) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of form of Summons filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan) (Entered: 10/06/2018)

3 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

3 #1

Category Sheet

#3

(#3) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding FILING OF CATEGORY SHEET AND COVER SHEET filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#2

(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Universal Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6065959.), filed by PEDRO COLON-MONCLOVA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP COLON-JAMES, BETTY JAMES-ULMER. Service due by 12/19/2018,(Saavedra-Castro, Juan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding filing of form of Summons filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/22/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan) (Entered: 10/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INFORMATIVE Motion regarding FILING OF CATEGORY SHEET AND COVER SHEET filed by Juan H. Saavedra-Castro on behalf of All Plaintiffs Responses due by 10/5/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Category Sheet, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Saavedra-Castro, Juan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CLERK'S NOTICE OF DEFECTIVE FILING Civil Cover Sheet (JS44), and Category Sheet not included electronically pursuant to L.Civ.R. 3(a). (arg) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Universal Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6065959.), filed by PEDRO COLON-MONCLOVA, CONJUGAL PARTNERSHIP COLON-JAMES, BETTY JAMES-ULMER. Service due by 12/19/2018,(Saavedra-Castro, Juan) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Conjugal Partnership Colon-Doe is a litigant

Latest cases where UNIVERSAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan H. Saavedra-Castro