Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/19/2020 at 15:58:55 (UTC).

Collins v. Texas Farmers Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/10/2018 Collins filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Texas Farmers Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Nelva Gonzales Ramos. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00364

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nelva Gonzales Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grace Michelle Collins

Defendant

Texas Farmers Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rajan Pandit

Attorney at Pandit Law Firm

701 Poydras St, Ste 3950

New Orleans, LA 70139

John Dennis Carter

Attorney at Pandit Law Firm LLC

701 Poydras Street, Suite 3950

New Orleans, LA 70139

Henry John Roth

Attorney at Pandit Law Firm LLC

701 Poydras St, Ste 3950

New Orleans, LA 70139

Phillip Norris Sanov

Attorney at Pandit Law

One Galleria Tower, 2700 Post Oak Blvd., 21St Floor

Houston, TX 77056

Defendant Attorneys

Iliaura Hands

Attorney at Nielsen & Treas, LLC

3838 N. Causeway Blvd., Suite 2850

Metairie, LA 70002

Douglas D. D'Arche

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

811 Main Street, Ste 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Keith Michael Detweiler

Attorney at Nielsen & Treas, LLC

3838 North Causeway Blvd, Ste 2850

Metairie, LA 70002

Ryan Anderson Walton

Attorney at Baker Hostetler

811 Main Street, 11Th Floor

Houston, TX 77002

Bradley K Jones

Attorney at Baker Hostetler LLP

811 Main St, Suite 1100

Houston, TX 77002

Kim Tran Britt

Attorney at Nielsen, Carter & Treas, LLC

3838 N Causeway Blvd, Ste 2850

Metairie, LA 77002

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) FINAL JUDGMENT. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

27 #1

Proposed Order

#27

(#27) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#26

(#26) ORDER: Dismissal Documents due by 10/21/2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/23/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Settlement by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. (Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry J. Roth on behalf of Grace Michelle Collins, filed. (Roth, Henry) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER #22 Joint Statement of Intent Regarding Mediation ( Mediation due by 9/3/2019., Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

#22

(#22) STATEMENT of Intent Regarding Mediation by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

#21

(#21) DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Grace Michelle Collins, filed.(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Corpus Christi Division; GRANTED, Case terminated on 10/19/2018(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

3 #1

Proposed Order

#3

(#3) MOTION to Transfer Case to Corpus Christi Division by Grace Michelle Collins, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit Declaration Page

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Texas Farmers Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21048008) filed by Grace Michelle Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Declaration Page)(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) FINAL JUDGMENT. (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER: Dismissal Documents due by 10/21/2019. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/23/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(vrios, 2) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Settlement by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. (Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Henry J. Roth on behalf of Grace Michelle Collins, filed. (Roth, Henry) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER #22 Joint Statement of Intent Regarding Mediation ( Mediation due by 9/3/2019., Status Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos)(Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(fcarbia, 2) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) STATEMENT of Intent Regarding Mediation by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 05/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Kim Tran Britt on behalf of Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed. (Britt, Kim) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Grace Michelle Collins, filed.(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Texas Farmers Insurance Company, filed.(Hands, Iliaura) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR***. FINAL JUDGMENT (Signed by Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos) Parties notified.(jmarks, 2) Modified on 12/26/2018 (jmarks, 2). (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Texas Farmers Insurance Company served on 12/10/2018, answer due 2/8/2019, filed.(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Grace Michelle Collins, filed.(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/18/2019 at 09:00 AM before Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos Parties notified.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • DocketCase transferred in from Houston Division Division on 10/19/2018 ; Case Number 4:18-cv-3721. Case assigned to Judge Nelva Gonzales Ramos. filed by Grace Michelle Collins, Texas Farmers Insurance Company.(dterrell, 2) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Corpus Christi Division; GRANTED, Case terminated on 10/19/2018(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Transfer Case to Corpus Christi Division by Grace Michelle Collins, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Texas Farmers Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-21048008) filed by Grace Michelle Collins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Declaration Page)(Pandit, Rajan) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Texas Farmers Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Dennis Carter

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rajan Pandit

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry John Roth