This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 07:53:29 (UTC).

Collins v. Henline (INMATE 3)

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 Collins filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Henline INMATE 3. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00875

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Darren Collins

Wetumpka, AL 36092

Defendants

Mike Henline

Steven T. Marshall

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jack William Willis

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

P O Box 300152

Montgomery, AL 36130-0152

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) ORDER directing that on or before 12/5/2018 petitioner may file a response to the answer filed by the respondents, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/15/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#15

(#15) ORDER directing the clerk to send a copy of this order to the address listed in order and to petitioner's address as listed on the court's docket sheet, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/15/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

13 #1

standing order & format

#13

(#13) (STRICKEN as docketing error) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mike Henline & Steven T. Marshall; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) Modified on 11/13/2018 (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

12 #2

Exhibit Ex-2 Record Excerpts

12 #1

Exhibit Ex-1 Record Excerpts

12 #3

Exhibit Ex-3 Elmore County Jail Records

#12

(#12) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Mike Henline, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex-1 Record Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Ex-2 Record Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Ex-3 Elmore County Jail Records)(Willis, Jack) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Darren Collins. (NO IFP. NO FILING FEE)(es, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#11

(#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of petition and order of procedure signed by (illegible) for Mike Henline served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack William Willis on behalf of Mike Henline, Steven T. Marshall (Willis, Jack) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mike Henline, Steven T. Marshall. (Willis, Jack) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#8

(#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of petition and order of procedure signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 11/14/2018, as further set out in order. Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Mike Henline & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/23/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#5

(#5) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Michael Darren Collins. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/23/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing the clerk modify the docket to add Steven T. Marshall, Attorney General for the State of Alabama as a respondent in this case, as further set out in order; ORDERING that Petitioner's initial filing (Doc. #1 ) be docketed as a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254; directing the clerk to amend the court docket to reflect the instant proceeding is properly filed as an action under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER directing that on or before 10/30/2018 petitioner shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the clerk sent petitioner a form for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/18. Mailed to petitioner w/IFP form, as directed.(djy, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Copy of #14 & #15 orders sent to Michael Darren Collins @ Elmore County Jail returned in mail with the following notation, "returned to sender-not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward" (NO PDF document attached to this notice). (djy, ) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER directing the clerk to send a copy of this order to the address listed in order and to petitioner's address as listed on the court's docket sheet, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/15/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ORDER directing that on or before 12/5/2018 petitioner may file a response to the answer filed by the respondents, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 11/15/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) (STRICKEN as docketing error) Notice of Deficiency requiring filing of Corporate Disclosure/Conflict Statement sent to Mike Henline & Steven T. Marshall; Corporate Disclosures due by 11/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 standing order & format)(djy, ) Modified on 11/13/2018 (qc/djy, ). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Mike Henline, Steven T. Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex-1 Record Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Ex-2 Record Excerpts, #3 Exhibit Ex-3 Elmore County Jail Records)(Willis, Jack) (Entered: 11/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Return Receipt Card showing service of petition and order of procedure signed by (illegible) for Mike Henline served on 10/25/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jack William Willis on behalf of Mike Henline, Steven T. Marshall (Willis, Jack) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate/Conflict Disclosure Statement by Mike Henline, Steven T. Marshall. (Willis, Jack) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Return Receipt Card showing service of petition and order of procedure signed by J. Taylor for Steven T. Marshall served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO ANSWER habeas petition on or before 11/14/2018, as further set out in order. Copy mailed to petitioner; mailed CMRRR w/copies of petition to Warden Mike Henline & Attorney General for the State of Alabama. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/23/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #5 application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/23/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Michael Darren Collins. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER directing the clerk modify the docket to add Steven T. Marshall, Attorney General for the State of Alabama as a respondent in this case, as further set out in order; ORDERING that Petitioner's initial filing (Doc. #1 ) be docketed as a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2254; directing the clerk to amend the court docket to reflect the instant proceeding is properly filed as an action under 28 U.S.C. 2254. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER directing that on or before 10/30/2018 petitioner shall either submit the $5.00 filing fee or file the appropriate affidavit in support of a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the clerk sent petitioner a form for filing a motion to proceed in forma pauperis, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/18. Mailed to petitioner w/IFP form, as directed.(djy, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER directing that petitioner's #1 initial filing be docketed as a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 USC 2254; directing the clerk to amend the court docket to reflect the instant proceeding is properly filed as an action under 28 USC 2254, as further set out in order. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 10/15/18. (djy, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Michael Darren Collins. (NO IFP. NO FILING FEE)(es, ) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.