This case was last updated from PACER on 11/19/2018 at 07:42:36 (UTC).

Collins v. Ferrell et al

Case Summary

On 09/20/2018 Collins filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Ferrell. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and Lisa G. Wood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    09/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

Lisa G. Wood

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamal E. Collins

Waycross, GA 31503

Defendants

Elizabeth Martyn

Thomas Ferrell

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jamal E. Collins. Plaintiff's current custodian shall deduct the initial partial filing fee of $107.00 from Plaintiff's prison trust account. A copy of this Order and a copy of the Consent to Collection of Fees shall be served upon the parties and Plaintiff's current custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/2/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) CONSENT by Prisoner Jamal E. Collins to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Jamal E. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

1 #13

Proposed Summons

1 #12

Letter

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #9

*Restricted*

1 #8

*Restricted*

1 #7

*Restricted*

1 #6

*Restricted*

1 #4

*Restricted*

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

*Restricted*

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamal E. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Letter)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #13 Proposed Summons) (ca). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Jamal E. Collins. Plaintiff's current custodian shall deduct the initial partial filing fee of $107.00 from Plaintiff's prison trust account. A copy of this Order and a copy of the Consent to Collection of Fees shall be served upon the parties and Plaintiff's current custodian. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 11/2/2018. (ca) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT by Prisoner Jamal E. Collins to collection of fees. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Jamal E. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement, #2 Envelope)(ca) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Jamal E. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/15/2018. (ca) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. PLRA due by 11/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 10/15/2018. (ca) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jamal E. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #2 Corrected PDF - envelope) (ca). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Inmate Account Statement by Jamal E. Collins. (ca) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamal E. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro.(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #2 Corrected PDF - envelope) (ca). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint, filing fee was omitted. Set/Reset Deadlines: Compliance due by 10/11/2018. (ca) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jamal E. Collins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Letter)(ca) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/20/2018: #13 Proposed Summons) (ca). (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less