Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/12/2019 at 08:12:39 (UTC).

Collins et al v. Del Castro et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 Collins filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Del Castro. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-03503

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Grace Collins

Fort Washington, MD 20744

Duk Sun Lyu

Fort Washington, MD 20744

Defendants

Saban Films, Inc.

Hannibal Productions, Inc.

Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro

Richard Rionda Del Castro

Speed Kills Production, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Neer Lerner

2600 W. Olive Ave. Ste. 1020

Burbank, CA 91505

William Zak Shirley

Attorney at The Law Office of W. Zak Shirley, LLC

1340 Smith Avenue, Suite 200

Baltimore, MD 21209

Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III

Attorney at Hamrick and Evans LLP

2600 W. Olive Ave. Ste. 1020

Burbank, CA 91505

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Move Case to Federal Civil/Criminal Court in Maryland for Breach of Contract, Fraud, and Possibly Rico Acts with Saban Films LLC, and MOTION to Rule on Saban Films, LLC Level of Liability for Still Exploiting the Movie with Knowledge of an Existing Lien and Acknowledging Working with a Person with White Collar Criminal Tendencies by Grace Collins, Duk Sun Lyu(rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

22 #2

Text of Proposed Order

22 #1

Memorandum in Support

#22

(#22) MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations and Exhibits by Richard Rionda Del Castro (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

23 #1

Envelope

#23

(#23) MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Move Case to Federal Civil/Criminal Court in Maryland for Breach of Contract, Fraud, and Possibly Rico Acts with Saban Films LLC, and MOTION to Rule on Saban Films, LLC Level of Liability for Still Exploiting the Movie with Knowledge of an Existing Lien and Acknowledging Working with a Person with White Collar Criminal Tendencies by Grace Collins, Duk Sun Lyu (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, transfer to U.S. District Court for the Central District of California filed by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Saban Films, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc..(Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

20 #1

Envelope

#20

(#20) Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Grace Collins and Duk Sun Lyu. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

1 #13

Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal filed in State Court

1 #11

Exhibit 1K - Praecipe

1 #10

Exhibit 1J - Amended Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Re

1 #9

Exhibit 1I - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #8

Exhibit 1H - Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #7

Exhibit 1G - Praecipe

1 #6

Exhibit 1F - Praecipe

1 #5

Exhibit 1E - Complaint and Jury Demand

1 #4

Exhibit 1D - Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Relief

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) AMENDED MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Move Case to Federal Civil/Criminal Court in Maryland for Breach of Contract, Fraud, and Possibly Rico Acts with Saban Films LLC, and MOTION to Rule on Saban Films, LLC Level of Liability for Still Exploiting the Movie with Knowledge of an Existing Lien and Acknowledging Working with a Person with White Collar Criminal Tendencies by Grace Collins, Duk Sun Lyu(rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations and Exhibits by Richard Rionda Del Castro (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION for Extension of Time, MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Move Case to Federal Civil/Criminal Court in Maryland for Breach of Contract, Fraud, and Possibly Rico Acts with Saban Films LLC, and MOTION to Rule on Saban Films, LLC Level of Liability for Still Exploiting the Movie with Knowledge of an Existing Lien and Acknowledging Working with a Person with White Collar Criminal Tendencies by Grace Collins, Duk Sun Lyu (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, transfer to U.S. District Court for the Central District of California filed by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Saban Films, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc..(Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Grace Collins and Duk Sun Lyu. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Supplemental (Motion for Extension to find a Federal Civil Plaintiff) to #10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Grace Collins. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CERTIFICATE of Counsel Pursuant to Local Rule 103(5)(a) by Neer Lerner on behalf of All Defendants (Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, transfer to U.S. District Court for the Central District of California filed by Grace Collins and Duk Sun Lyu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Saban Films, Inc. (Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Supplemental to Defendants' Statement Pursuant to Standing Order Re: Removal (Lerner, Neer) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the alternative, transfer to U.S. District Court for the Central District of California by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Saban Films, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit of William V. Bromiley Jr., #3 Affidavit of Richard Rionda Del Castro)(Shirley, William) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Neer Lerner. Directing attorney Neer Lerner to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III. Directing attorney Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 11/19/2018. (srd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Neer Lerner (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7677844.) by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc.(Shirley, William) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alpheus Raymond Hamrick III (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7677843.) by Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro, Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc.(Shirley, William) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 11/14/2018. (c/m 11/14/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Correspondence from Clerk to plaintiffs re: removal notification (c/m 11/14/18 jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • Case assigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. (cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc. (Shirley, William) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Prince George's County, Maryland, case number CAL 18-37261. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7667791), filed by Richard Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Productions, Inc., Speed Kills Production, Inc., Patricia Eberle Rionda Del Castro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1A (Part 1) - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1B - Summons, #3 Exhibit 1C - Aff. of Service, #4 Exhibit 1D - Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Relief, #5 Exhibit 1E - Complaint and Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit 1F - Praecipe, #7 Exhibit 1G - Praecipe, #8 Exhibit 1H - Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #9 Exhibit 1I - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #10 Exhibit 1J - Amended Motion to Amend File and Reconsider Emergency Injunctive Relief, #11 Exhibit 1K - Praecipe, #12 Exhibit 1L - Court Orders, #13 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Removal filed in State Court, #14 Civil Cover Sheet, #15 Exhibit 1A (Part 2) - Complaint)(Shirley, William) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Speed Kills Production, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alpheus Raymond Hamrick, III