This case was last updated from PACER on 05/22/2019 at 23:42:04 (UTC).

Collateral Analytics LLC v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/02/2018 Collateral Analytics LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nationstar Mortgage LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jacqueline Scott Corley and Richard Seeborg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00019

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jacqueline Scott Corley

Presiding Judge

Richard Seeborg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Collateral Analytics LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Xome Settlement Services, LLC

Nationstar Mortgage LLC

Quantarium, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Ragesh K. Tangri

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Clement S. Roberts

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Frances Cheever

Attorney at Orrick Herrington Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Jacob Marcus Heath

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Lauren Kapsky

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Timothy Patrick Horgan-Kobelski

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Michael John Miguel

Attorney at McKool Smith Hennigan, P.C.

300 South Grand Avenue, Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ashley Nicole Farris Moore

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Lawrence M. Hadley

Attorney at Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro LLP

10250 Constellation Blvd., 19Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Christian Alexander Harris

Attorney at McKool Smith

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Rudolph Fink, IV

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Avery Roderick Williams

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Robert M. Manley

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

Chelsea Ann Ayres Priest

Attorney at McKool Smith, P.C.

300 Crescent Court, Suite 1500

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

157 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#157

(#157) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13369861.) filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Harris, Christian) (Filed on 5/22/2019) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

156 #3

Exhibit C

156 #2

Exhibit B

156 #1

Exhibit A

#156

(#156) REPLY (re #148 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality ) In Support of Motion to Retain Confidentiality filed byNationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Manley, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2019) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

148 #2

Exhibit B

148 #1

Exhibit A

#148

(#150) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING BEFORE THE DISCOVERY JUDGE. The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Retain Confidentiality #148 is reset for 5/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

3 #4

*Restricted*

3 #3

Redacted Complaint

3 #2

Proposed Order

3 #1

Declaration of Clement S. Roberts

2 #2

Summons

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11990173.). Filed byCollateral Analytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

306 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#157) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-13369861.) filed by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Harris, Christian) (Filed on 5/22/2019) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#156) REPLY (re #148 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality ) In Support of Motion to Retain Confidentiality filed byNationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Manley, Robert) (Filed on 5/10/2019) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#155) ORDER REGARDING JOINT DISCOVERY LETTER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER #118 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley on 5/9/2019. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2019) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines as to #148 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality . Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2019 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#154) NOTICE by Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC pursuant to Local Rule 7-13 notifying the Court that the Joint Letter Brief at Docket 118 remains under submission (Manley, Robert) (Filed on 5/8/2019) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • (#153) CLERK'S NOTICE THE MOTION [#139] SCHEDULED FOR HEARING ON MAY 9, 2019 AT 1:30 P.M. SHALL BE SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT PURSUANT TO CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b). ACCORDINGLY, THE MOTION HEARING IS VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2019) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#152) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #148 MOTION to Retain Confidentiality ) filed byCollateral Analytics LLC. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 5/3/2019) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#151) REPLY (re #139 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand ) filed byNationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC. (Manley, Robert) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#150) CLERK'S NOTICE RESCHEDULING MOTION HEARING BEFORE THE DISCOVERY JUDGE. The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Retain Confidentiality #148 is reset for 5/30/2019 at 9:00 a.m. in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. The briefing schedule shall remain the same. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (ahm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#149) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER, Case referred to mediation. Jury Selection/Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Pretrial Conference set for 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 03, 17th Floor before Judge Richard Seeborg. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 4/22/19. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2019) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
140 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2018
  • (#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/9/2018) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Collateral Analytics LLC.. (Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 1/5/2018) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Collateral Analytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dr. Michael Sklarz, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Version of Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities, #4 Unredacted Version of Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Entities)(Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 1/5/2018) (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/5/2018 10:00 AM. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) Modified on 1/3/2018 (hdjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • (#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/17/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2018) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Ragesh K. Tangri (Tangri, Ragesh) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Complaint filed by Collateral Analytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Clement S. Roberts, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Redacted Complaint, #4 Unredacted Complaint)(Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Quantarium, LLC, Xome Settlement Services, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-11990173.). Filed byCollateral Analytics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roberts, Clement) (Filed on 1/2/2018) (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Patrick Horgan-Kobelski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Marcus Heath