This case was last updated from PACER on 04/06/2018 at 01:15:29 (UTC).

Coleman v. Veolia Water West Operating Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/19/2015 Coleman filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Veolia Water West Operating Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laurel Beeler. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:15-CV-00779

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laurel Beeler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timotheus Coleman

Defendant

VEOLIA WATER WEST OPERATING SERVICES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Emily Claire Schuman

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)

#23

(#23) ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)

#18

(#18) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2015.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/24/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/13/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/10/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/6/2015.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/24/15. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.