This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Coleman, Sidney et al v. Wisconsin Department of Corrections et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Coleman, Sidney filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wisconsin Department of Corrections. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00673

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sidney L. Coleman

Madison, WI 53703

Lakesha M. Johnson

Madison, WI 53711

Defendants

Maggie Thomas

Wisconsin Department of Corrections

Leann Moberly

Michele Krueger

Amr Yassin

Kurt Schwann

Genoveva Calderson

Brooke

Christopher Dubman

Angela Fischer

Jane Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER on plaintiff Sidney Coleman's ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 10.63 assessed. Plaintiff Coleman's initial partial filing fee due 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER directing plaintiff Lakesha Johnson to submit the filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

1 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) PLRA Fee Collection Letter. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#10

(#10) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lakesha M. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

2 #1

Receipt

#8

(#8) Letter from clerk's office in response to #6 Letter from Plaintiff Coleman requesting a fee waiver form and information re: 42 U.S.C. 1983 and 28 U.S.C. 1331. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

2 #2

Envelope

#7

(#7) Mail sent to Lakesha M. Johnson returned as undeliverable re #5 Order. Re-sent #5 order to plaintiff Johnson at 1186 Moorland Rd, Apt. 208, Madison, WI 53713-4056. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sidney L. Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Johnson granted leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/5/2018. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

10 #1

Envelope

#3

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) Letter from Plaintiff Coleman requesting a fee waiver form and information re: 42 U.S.C. 1983 and 28 U.S.C. 1331. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER on ifp request: Plaintiff Johnson granted leave to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Complaint taken under advisement for screening. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/5/2018. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lakesha M. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PLRA Fee Collection Letter. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Partial Filing fee received : $ 10.63, receipt number 34690032736 (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter from clerk's office in response to #6 Letter from Plaintiff Coleman requesting a fee waiver form and information re: 42 U.S.C. 1983 and 28 U.S.C. 1331. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Mail sent to Lakesha M. Johnson returned as undeliverable re #5 Order. Re-sent #5 order to plaintiff Johnson at 1186 Moorland Rd, Apt. 208, Madison, WI 53713-4056. (nln),(ps) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Letter from Plaintiff Coleman requesting a fee waiver form and information re: 42 U.S.C. 1983 and 28 U.S.C. 1331. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER directing plaintiff Lakesha Johnson to submit the filing fee or a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER on plaintiff Sidney Coleman's ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 10.63 assessed. Plaintiff Coleman's initial partial filing fee due 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Sidney L. Coleman (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sidney L. Coleman. (Attachments: #1 Receipt, #2 Envelope) (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sidney L. Coleman, Lakesha M. Johnson. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jef) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.