This case was last updated from U.S. Courts Of Appeals on 11/10/2018 at 00:37:25 (UTC).

Code Revision Commission, Et Al V. Public.Resource.Org, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/07/2017 a Intellectual Property - Copyright case was filed by Code Revision Commission against Public Resource Org, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. Courts Of Appeals, U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    17-11589

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    U.S. Court Of Appeals, Eleventh Circuit

 

Party Details

Others

The Organization For Transformative Works

Judicata

Free Law Project

Amicus Curiae

American Civil Liberties Union Foundation

The Association Of Research Libraries

Next Generation Legal Research Platforms

Public Knowledge

The Institute Of Intellectual Property And Social Justice

Defendant / Appellant

Public.Resource.Org, Inc.

Plaintiff / Appellee

Code Revision Commission, For The Benefit Of And On Behalf Of General Assembly Of Georgia

 

Court Documents

Open Document

Signed Approved Bill of costs filed by Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellees State of Georgia and Code Revision Commission. [Entered: 11/07/2018 03:48 PM]

Open Document

Bill of costs filed by Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellees Code Revision Commission and State of Georgia. [17-11589] (ECF: Anthony Askew) [Entered: 11/02/2018 06:22 PM]

Open Document #2

OPIN-1A Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Opinion

Open Document

Notice under FRAP 28(j) of supplemental authority filed by Attorney Elizabeth Hannah Rader for Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Elizabeth Rader) [Entered: 07/20/2018 12:45 PM]

Open Document

Letter to the Court regarding representation of Defendant-Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in a matter between it and the State of Mississippi. filed by Attorney Sarah Parker LaFantano for Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Sarah LaFantano) [Entered: 11/13/2017 01:13 PM]

Open Document #2

MOT-2 Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document #1

Court Order Filed

Open Document #2

District Court Order Appealed From

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Statement Filed

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah Parker LaFantano for Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Sarah LaFantano) [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:25 PM]

Open Document

APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth H. Rader for Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Sarah LaFantano) [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:25 PM]

Open Document #5

DKT-7CIV Notice to Counsel/Parties

Open Document #4

usdc 52

Open Document #3

usdc 46

Open Document #2

usdc 44

Open Document #1

Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Signed Approved Bill of costs filed by Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellees State of Georgia and Code Revision Commission. [Entered: 11/07/2018 03:48 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Bill of costs filed by Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellees Code Revision Commission and State of Georgia. [17-11589] (ECF: Anthony Askew) [Entered: 11/02/2018 06:22 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Opinion issued by court as to Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. Decision: Reversed in part, Vacated in part and Remanded. Opinion type: Published. Opinion method: Signed. The opinion is also available through the Court's Opinions page at this link # http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/opinions . [Entered: 10/19/2018 12:39 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Judgment entered as to Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. [Entered: 10/19/2018 12:36 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice under FRAP 28(j) of supplemental authority filed by Attorney Elizabeth Hannah Rader for Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Elizabeth Rader) [Entered: 07/20/2018 12:45 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Oral argument held. Oral Argument participants were Vera Eidelman for Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Georgia, Elizabeth Hannah Rader for Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. and Lisa Pavento for Appellees State of Georgia and Code Revision Commission. [Entered: 11/16/2017 02:35 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter to the Court regarding representation of Defendant-Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in a matter between it and the State of Mississippi. filed by Attorney Sarah Parker LaFantano for Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Sarah LaFantano) [Entered: 11/13/2017 01:13 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Motion to appear pro hac vice filed by Vera Eidelman is GRANTED. [8292102-2] SM [Entered: 11/06/2017 04:30 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • MOTION to appear pro hac vice filed by Attorney Vera Eidelman for Amicus Curiae American Civil Liberties Union of Georgia. [8292102-1] [Entered: 11/06/2017 04:27 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER: Amicus Curiae's, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation, American Civil Liberties Union Foundation of Georgia, Inc., Southern Poverty Law Center, Center for Democracy & Technology and Georgia Coalition for The People's Agenda motion for leave to participate in oral argument on time ceded by Appellant is GRANTED. ENTERED FOR THE COURT - BY DIRECTION [ # 8254595-2 ] [Entered: 10/06/2017 11:47 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Lisa Pavento for Appellee State of Georgia in 17-11589, Attorney Lisa Pavento for Appellee Code Revision Commission in 17-11589. [Entered: 04/21/2017 10:13 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Warren James Thomas for State of Georgia and Code Revision Commission. (ECF: Warren Thomas) [Entered: 04/21/2017 09:41 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Lisa Pavento for State of Georgia and Code Revision Commission. (ECF: Lisa Pavento) [Entered: 04/21/2017 09:37 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellee State of Georgia in 17-11589, Attorney Anthony B. Askew for Appellee Code Revision Commission in 17-11589. [Entered: 04/20/2017 01:32 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Anthony B. Askew for State of Georgia and Code Revision Commission. (ECF: Anthony Askew) [Entered: 04/20/2017 11:02 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • E-filed Appearance of Counsel processed for Attorney Sarah Parker LaFantano for Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. in 17-11589. [Entered: 04/19/2017 10:12 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Appeal Statement filed by Attorney Sarah Parker LaFantano for Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Sarah LaFantano) [Entered: 04/18/2017 04:08 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Sarah Parker LaFantano for Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Sarah LaFantano) [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Elizabeth H. Rader for Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. (ECF: Sarah LaFantano) [Entered: 04/18/2017 02:25 PM]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc. on 04/07/2017. Fee Status: Fee Paid. No hearings to be transcribed. The appellant's brief is due on or before 05/17/2017. The appendix is due no later than 7 days from the filing of the appellant's brief. Awaiting Appellant's CIP Due on or before 04/21/2017 as to Appellant Public.Resource.Org, Inc.. Awaiting Appellee's CIP due on or before 05/05/2017 as to Appellees Code Revision Commission and State of Georgia [Entered: 04/14/2017 08:29 AM]

    Read MoreRead Less