This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:01:45 (UTC).

Cobble v. U. S. Gov.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Cobble filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against U S Gov. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steve C. Jones and Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04031

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Daniel Eric Cobble

Americus, GA 31719

Respondent

U. S. Gov.

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MOTION to add Relief to all Suits Wrongly Dismissed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (rjs) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Reopen Case by Daniel Eric Cobble. (jkl) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - the undersigned ORDERS that plaintiff's miscellaneous Motions [2, 3] are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that plaintiff be DENIED leave to proceed IFP and this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/10/18. (klb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#7

(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (rjs)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 09/28/2018)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, titled, Motion for Court to Rule, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Court to Rule Civil # 1:02-cv-2821 by Daniel Eric Cobble. (rjs) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/10/18. (klb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #8 MOTION to Reopen Case to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (jkl) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Reopen Case by Daniel Eric Cobble. (jkl) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Civil Case Terminated. (rjs) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Daniel Eric Cobble re #6 Order and #7 Clerk's Judgment. (rjs) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (rjs)--Please refer to http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov to obtain an appeals jurisdiction checklist-- (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation as the Opinion and Order of this Court. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 9/28/2018. (rjs) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble, to District Judge Steve C. Jones. (pdw) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Daniel Eric Cobble re #5 Order for Service of Order and Final Report and Recommendation and #4 ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. (klb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Order and Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/10/18. (klb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER AND FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - the undersigned ORDERS that plaintiff's miscellaneous Motions [2, 3] are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The undersigned RECOMMENDS that plaintiff be DENIED leave to proceed IFP and this action be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate the referral to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/10/18. (klb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • ORDER - the undersigned ORDERS that plaintiff's miscellaneous Motions [2, 3] are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (found in text of Order and Final Report & Recommendation). Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 9/10/18. (klb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to add Relief to all Suits Wrongly Dismissed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (rjs) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Court to Rule Civil # 1:02-cv-2821 by Daniel Eric Cobble. (rjs) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Submission of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, for IFP and Frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. (eop) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, titled, Motion for Court to Rule, filed by Daniel Eric Cobble. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.