This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:35:06 (UTC).

Clifton v. Parkview Health System Inc

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Clifton filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Parkview Health System Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul R Cherry and Theresa L Springmann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00289

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul R Cherry

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Clifton

Defendant

Parkview Health System Inc

Not Classified By Court

Anthony Stites

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Jennifer L Hitchcock

Attorney at Law Office of Jennifer L Hitchcock

116 E Berry St Ste 1110

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorney

Robert D Moreland

Attorney at Rob Moreland Attorney at Law

Po Box 362

Angola, IN 46703

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Parkview Health System Inc.(Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jansen, Lori) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Hitchcock on behalf of Susan Clifton (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#9

(#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Court to initiate call. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 10/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/25/2018. (mr) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#5

(#5) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Parkview Health System Inc ; answer due by October 19, 2018. (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkview Health System Inc. (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE by Parkview Health System Inc of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Moreland on behalf of Parkview Health System Inc (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3679560.) from Allen Superior, Cause No. 02D03-1808-CT-451, filed by Parkview Health System Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 10/23/2018 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by atty Lori Jansen. Dft appeared by atty Robert Moreland. All dates/ddl in Joint Report at #11 through close of discovery are adopted and incorporated herein. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 12/17/2018. Any motion for leave to amend pleadings to be filed by 1/22/2019 by Pla, and 2/22/2019 by Dft. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 3/22/2019. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/22/2019. Discovery deadline is 9/27/2019. Expert Discovery deadline is 5/22/2019. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/13/2018. The summary judgment ddl in FRCP 56 shall not apply. All other dates/ddl to be set by presiding trial judge upon conclusion of discovery. Anthony Stites appointed as mediator. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ANSWER to Complaint by Parkview Health System Inc.(Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jansen, Lori) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Hitchcock on behalf of Susan Clifton (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/23/2018 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Court to initiate call. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) to be filed by 10/17/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/25/2018. (mr) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • (#7) ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/21/2018. (mr) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Per #5 Defendant Parkview Health System Inc answer due 10/19/2018. (rmc) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry added. (NEW CASE) (rmc) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Parkview Health System Inc ; answer due by October 19, 2018. (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkview Health System Inc. (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE by Parkview Health System Inc of Filing and Service of Notification of Removal (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Moreland on behalf of Parkview Health System Inc (Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3679560.) from Allen Superior, Cause No. 02D03-1808-CT-451, filed by Parkview Health System Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moreland, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less