This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/10/2019 at 07:57:21 (UTC).

Clayton Homes, Inc. v. Carter et al (PLR1)

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Clayton Homes, Inc filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Carter PLR1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela L Reeves and Debra C Poplin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00523

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Pamela L Reeves

Referral Judge

Debra C Poplin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Clayton Homes, Inc.

Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan

Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee

Defendants

Judy K. Spradlin

Stacy Ann Carter

Allison Bailey Carter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grace R Murphy

Defendant Attorney

Kevin W Shepherd

 

Court Documents

18 #1

Exhibit A Return of Service

#18

17 #1

Exhibit A Return of Service

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

11 #1

Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing

#2

1 #7

Other Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F Letters of Administration

1 #5

Exhibit E Cover Page Clayton Plan

1 #4

Exhibit D Divorce Decree

1 #3

Exhibit C Certificate of Death (2)

1 #2

Exhibit B Certificate of Death (1)

1 #1

Exhibit A Beneficiary Form

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee, Clayton Homes, Inc., Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan. Allison Bailey Carter served on 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Return of Service)(Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee, Clayton Homes, Inc., Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan. Stacy Ann Carter served on 12/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Return of Service)(Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Administrative Notice to Counsel Grace Murphy re: #15 Subpoena Returned Executed, #14 Subpoena Returned Executed : Please refile documents 14 and 15 with the document that was served not just the green cards. It is unclear is this is for the summons or subpoenas. If this is the return of service of the summons, then please use the event summons returned executed. Requirements due by 1/29/2019. (ABF) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) [REFILED CORRECTLY AS #18 ] SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Allison Bailey Carter on 12/17/2018 (Murphy, Grace) Modified on 1/25/2019 (ABF). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) [REFILED CORRECTLY AS #17 ] SUBPOENA Returned Executed as to Stacy Ann Carter on 12/18/2018 (Murphy, Grace) Modified on 1/25/2019 (ABF). (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin W Shepherd on behalf of Stacy Ann Carter (Shepherd, Kevin) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 12/17/2018. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3840129.) filed by Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee, Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan, Clayton Homes, Inc. (ABF) (Entered: 12/17/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3840129.) by Clayton Homes, Inc., Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan, Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing)(Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Pamela L Reeves on 12/13/2018. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons for Stacy Ann Carter by Clayton Homes, Inc., Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan, Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee. (Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Sumons for Allison Bailey Carter by Clayton Homes, Inc., Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan, Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee. (Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, Summons for Judy K. Spradlin by Clayton Homes, Inc., Clayton Homes, Inc. 401(k) Retirement Plan, Clayton Homes, Inc. Retirement Plan Committee. (Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketDistrict Judge Pamela L Reeves and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (BJL, ) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Clayton Homes, Inc.. (Murphy, Grace) Modified on 12/13/2018 (BJL, ). Added Corporate Parent - Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. to Clayton Homes, Inc. Role - pla (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Allison Bailey Carter, Stacy Ann Carter, Judy K. Spradlin ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3838303.), filed by Clayton Homes, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Beneficiary Form, #2 Exhibit B Certificate of Death (1), #3 Exhibit C Certificate of Death (2), #4 Exhibit D Divorce Decree, #5 Exhibit E Cover Page Clayton Plan, #6 Exhibit F Letters of Administration, #7 Other Civil Cover Sheet)(Murphy, Grace) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less