This case was last updated from PACER on 11/09/2018 at 07:41:51 (UTC).

CLAY v. TOOMBS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 CLAY filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against TOOMBS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Benjamin W. Cheesbro and R. Stan Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00092

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Benjamin W. Cheesbro

Presiding Judge

R. Stan Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENNETH CLAY

Vidalia, GA 30475

Defendant

Toombs County Sheriff's Office

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Transferal of Action re #1 Complaint. (jrb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

8 #1

*Restricted*

#8

(#8) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:18-cv-00148. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 09/10/2018)

6 #1

Envelope

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis / Affidavit and Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by KENNETH CLAY (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). Modified on 8/2/2018 (ggs). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

4 #2

Envelope

4 #1

State Court Documents

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, by KENNETH CLAY (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#3

(#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KENNETH CLAY (glg) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court. (glg) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

1 #3

State Court Amended Motion to Dismiss

1 #2

State Court Order

1 #1

INMATE NOTICE

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #5 . (jrb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Transferal of Action re #1 Complaint. (jrb) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Case transfer in from District of Georgia Middle; Case Number 4:18-cv-00148. Case transferred electronically (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Case Electronically Transferred Out - District Transfer to Souther District of Georgia. All documents, including a certified copy of the docket sheet and pleading were transferred electronically. **The Notice of Electronic Filing serves as certification for these transferred documents.**(Case Transfer Acknowledgment deadline 9/21/2018.) (tlf) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER transferring proceedings to the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Georgia. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND on 9/7/2018(tlf). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Exhibits amending #1 Complaint, filed by KENNETH CLAY (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlp) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis / Affidavit and Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by KENNETH CLAY (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(tlf). Modified on 8/2/2018 (ggs). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT re #1 Complaint, by KENNETH CLAY (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Envelope)(tlf). (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to KENNETH CLAY (glg) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hyles issued at the direction of the Court. (glg) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against TOOMBS COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE filed by KENNETH CLAY (Attachments: #1 INMATE NOTICE, #2 State Court Order, #3 State Court Amended Motion to Dismiss)(glg) Modified on 7/23/2018 (tlp) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less