This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2018 at 07:04:28 (UTC).

Clark v. City of Memphis et al

Case Summary

On 09/30/2018 Clark filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Memphis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02676

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Likisha Clark

Defendants

Jon Alsup

Garrett O'Brien

Stephen Westrich

City of Memphis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Terrell L. Tooten

Attorney at Terrell Tooten

1160 Vickery Lane, Ste 2

Cordova, TN 38016

Defendant Attorneys

Mary Elizabeth McKinney

Attorney at GODWIN MORRIS LAURENZI & BLOOMFIELD, P.C.

50 N. Front St., Ste. 800

Memphis, TN 38103

Deborah E. Godwin

Attorney at GODWIN MORRIS LAURENZI & BLOOMFIELD, P.C.

50 N. Front St., Ste. 800

Memphis, TN 38103

Sean Antone Hunt

Attorney at THE HUNT LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 171119

Memphis, TN 38187-1119

Barbaralette G. Davis

Attorney at CITY OF MEMPHIS, CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

125 North Main Street, Room 336

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Likisha Clark. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#26

(#26) SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 12/7/2018 at 11:30 AM is RESET in time only to 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

25 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss

#25

(#25) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Memphis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hunt, Sean) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah E. Godwin on behalf of Jon Alsup, Garrett O'Brien, Stephen Westrich (Godwin, Deborah) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

23 #1

Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss

#23

(#23) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jon Alsup, Garrett O'Brien, Stephen Westrich. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(McKinney, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#22

(#22) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 12/7/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#21

(#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Likisha Clark as to Jon Alsup. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

10 #2

Summons

10 #1

Summons

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Summons by Terrell L. Tooten on behalf of Likisha Clark. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to City of Memphis. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Summons by Terrell L. Tooten on behalf of Likisha Clark. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTACHMENT signed civil cover sheet to 3 Deficiency Notice,, by Likisha Clark.. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#3) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Likisha Clark has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the civil cover sheet is missing your s/signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Likisha Clark has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer did not indicate in the docket text "proposed order submitted". If no order previously emailed to chambers, please do so upon receipt of this notice. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Likisha Clark. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) SETTING LETTER: The Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for Friday, 12/7/2018 at 11:30 AM is RESET in time only to 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by City of Memphis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Hunt, Sean) (Entered: 11/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah E. Godwin on behalf of Jon Alsup, Garrett O'Brien, Stephen Westrich (Godwin, Deborah) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jon Alsup, Garrett O'Brien, Stephen Westrich. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss)(McKinney, Mary) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Friday, 12/7/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Likisha Clark as to Jon Alsup. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #19 Motion to Extend Deadline. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/18. (Sullivan, Daniel) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Extend Deadline To Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead, proposed order submitted by City of Memphis. (Hunt, Sean) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Summons by Terrell L. Tooten on behalf of Likisha Clark. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to City of Memphis. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Summons by Terrell L. Tooten on behalf of Likisha Clark. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#7) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTACHMENT signed civil cover sheet to 3 Deficiency Notice,, by Likisha Clark.. (Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEFICIENCY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Complaint filed by Likisha Clark has been filed. However, the following deficiency has been found: the civil cover sheet is missing your s/signature.. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. The filer has one business day to correct the deficiency. (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jld) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2891441), filed by Likisha Clark. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tooten, Terrell) (Entered: 09/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less