This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/01/2018 at 07:01:13 (UTC).

Clark v. Beauty Solutions, Ltd.

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Clark filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against Beauty Solutions, Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sallie Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-04663

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sallie Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Howard Clark

Defendant

Beauty Solutions, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Christopher Hamilton

Attorney at The Weston Firm

1405 Morena Blvd., Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

Gregory Weston

Attorney at The Weston Firm

1405 Morena Blvd, Suite 201

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) STATUS REPORT re Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Howard Clark. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Clark. Beauty Solutions, Ltd. served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#10

(#10) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Howard Clark (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Howard Clark.. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#7

(#7) Civil Cover Sheet by Howard Clark Corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/7/2018) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Defendant Beauty Solutions, Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Hamilton (Hamilton, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of: CAL. BUS. & PROF. CODE Sections 17200 et seq.; CAL BUS. & PROF. CODE Sections 17500 et seq.; CAL CIV. CODE Sections 1750 et seq.; and for Breach of Express and Implied Warranties; and Negligent Misrepresentation against Beauty Solutions, Ltd., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12563827). Filed by Howard Clark. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/2/2018) Modified on 8/6/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) STATUS REPORT re Time for Defendant to Respond to Complaint by Howard Clark. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Howard Clark. Beauty Solutions, Ltd. served on 8/13/2018, answer due 9/4/2018. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 9/11/2018) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Certificate of Interested Entities by Howard Clark (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Howard Clark.. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/10/2018) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Civil Cover Sheet by Howard Clark Corrected Civil Cover Sheet. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/7/2018) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Defendant Beauty Solutions, Ltd.. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/29/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2018 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2018) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. Case has been randomly assigned to Judge, however incorrect Civil Cover Sheet used when filing initial documents (JS-CAND 44 (Rev 12/12 CAND REV (1/15/13 ). Please complete current Civil Cover Sheet of JS-CAND-44 (Rev. 06/17) and re-file as separate docket Re: #1 Complaint filed by Howard Clark (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Christopher Hamilton (Hamilton, Andrew) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Proposed Summons. (Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/2/2018) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT for Violations of: CAL. BUS. & PROF. CODE Sections 17200 et seq.; CAL BUS. & PROF. CODE Sections 17500 et seq.; CAL CIV. CODE Sections 1750 et seq.; and for Breach of Express and Implied Warranties; and Negligent Misrepresentation against Beauty Solutions, Ltd., (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-12563827). Filed by Howard Clark. (Attachments: #(1) Civil Cover Sheet)(Weston, Gregory) (Filed on 8/2/2018) Modified on 8/6/2018 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Christopher Hamilton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory Weston