Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2017 at 16:00:16 (UTC).

City of San Diego v. Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2016 City of San Diego filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L P . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William V. Gallo and Michael M. Anello. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:16-CV-01398

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Anello

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

City of San Diego

San Diego, The City of

Defendants

Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P

Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C.

Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc.

Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D"

Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc.

SFPP, L.P.

Does 1-100

Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel F Bamberg

Attorney at Office of the City Attorney

1200 Third Avenue, Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

Steven Russell Tekosky

Attorney at Tatro Tekosky Sadwick LLP

333 S. Grand Avenue, Suite 4270

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Defendant Attorney

M Ray Hartman, III

Attorney at COOLEY LLP

4401 Eastgate Mall

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

1 #9

Proof of Service

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #4

Exhibit 3

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court, San Diego County, Central Division, case number 37-2016-000-15618-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9129024.), filed by Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., SFPP, L.P., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:16-cv-01398-L-BGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(fth) (sjt). (Entered: 06/08/2016)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", SFPP, L.P., Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc. (fth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

3 #2

Exhibit 2

3 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", SFPP, L.P., Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc. of case(s) 07cv1883-MMA-WVG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(fth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge M. James Lorenz, Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:07-cv-01883-MMA-WVG. The new case number is 16-1398-MMA-WVG. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/8/2016. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/8/2016.(sjt) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

5 #1

Cert of Service

#5

(#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", SFPP, L.P., Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Hartman, M) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

#6

(#6) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Kinder Morgan's Time to Respond to Complaint #5 . Kinder Morgan must respond to the City of San Diego's complaint on or before 7/14/2016. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/9/2016. (vam) (Entered: 06/09/2016)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by San Diego, The City of. (Tekosky, Steven)Attorney Steven Russell Tekosky added to party San Diego, The City of(pty:pla) (Entered: 06/17/2016)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice #7 . The Court Dismisses this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk is instructed to close the case file. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/17/2016. (vam)(sjt). (Entered: 06/17/2016)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice #7 . The Court Dismisses this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. The Clerk is instructed to close the case file. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/17/2016. (vam)(sjt). (Entered: 06/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice by San Diego, The City of. (Tekosky, Steven)Attorney Steven Russell Tekosky added to party San Diego, The City of(pty:pla) (Entered: 06/17/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Kinder Morgan's Time to Respond to Complaint #5 . Kinder Morgan must respond to the City of San Diego's complaint on or before 7/14/2016. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/9/2016. (vam) (Entered: 06/09/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or to Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", SFPP, L.P., Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Cert of Service)(Hartman, M) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge M. James Lorenz, Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:07-cv-01883-MMA-WVG. The new case number is 16-1398-MMA-WVG. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 6/8/2016. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 6/8/2016.(sjt) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", SFPP, L.P., Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc. of case(s) 07cv1883-MMA-WVG. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(fth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", SFPP, L.P., Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc. (fth) (Entered: 06/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court, San Diego County, Central Division, case number 37-2016-000-15618-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-9129024.), filed by Kinder Morgan G.P., Inc., Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P., SFPP, L.P., Kinder Morgan Operating, L.P. "D", Santa Fe Pacific Pipelines, Inc., Kinder Morgan Management, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:16-cv-01398-L-BGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(fth) (sjt). (Entered: 06/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kinder Morgan Energy Partners, L.P is a litigant

Latest cases where SFPP, L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kinder Morgan Operating LP D is a litigant

Latest cases where Kinder Morgan Transmix Company, LLC is a litigant