This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2020 at 20:08:52 (UTC).

City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System v. Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2018 City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Vernon S. Broderick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03608

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vernon S. Broderick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System

Petitioners

Bernard Selz Revocable Trust

James Goetz

Selz Capital LLC

Thomas J. Stone Trust

Bernard T. Selz 2008 15-Year Charitable Lead Annuity Trust

Selz Family 2011 Trust

Municipal Employees' Retirement System of Michigan

Defendants

James Hooke

Jay Davis

Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation

Richard D. Courtney

Liam Stewart

George W. Carmany III

Henry E. Lentz

Martin Stanley

Barclays Capital Inc.

Norman H. Brown, Jr.

Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.

Barclay Capital Inc.

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Avi Josefson

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Petitioner Attorneys

Robert N. Kaplan

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP (NYC)

850 Third Avenue, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10022

Kim Elaine Miller

Attorney at Kahn Swick & Foti, LLC

206 Covington Street

Madisonville, LA 70447

Jeremy Alan Lieberman

Attorney at Pomerantz LLP

600 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

David Avi Rosenfeld

Attorney at Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP (LI)

58 South Service Road, Suite 200

Melville, NY 11747

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Walter Reinthaler

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (NY)

5 Firestone Drive

Pinehurst, NC 28474

John Erik Schreiber

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP (CA)

333 S. Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Susanna Michele Buergel

Attorney at Paul Weiss (NY)

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Alison Rebecca Gross Benedon

Attorney at Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Christopher Martin Paparella

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson, LLP (NYC)

1114 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Other Attorneys

James Michael Fee

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

51 W. 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Shannon Lee Hopkins

Attorney at Levi & Korsinsky, LLP

1111 Summer Street, Suite 403

Stamford, CT 06905

Nicholas Stephen Hirst

Attorney at Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP

1325 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Salvatore Jo Graziano

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

John G. Moon

Attorney at Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP

1325 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Jesse Lee Jensen

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Lauren Amy Ormsbee

Attorney at Bernstein Litowitz Berger & Grossmann LLP

1251 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

Lori Marks-Esterman

Attorney at Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP

1325 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

 

Court Documents

#117

#116

115 #9

Exhibit I - Chart

115 #8

Exhibit H - Form 8-K

115 #7

Exhibit G - Form 4

115 #6

Exhibit F - Form 4

115 #5

Exhibit E - Form 4

115 #4

Exhibit D - Form 10-K (Excerpt)

115 #1

Exhibit A - Transcript

#115

#100

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

216 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#117) ORDER denying #116 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. APPLICATION DENIED. SO ORDERED. If, after reviewing the parties' briefs, I determine that oral argument is necessary, I will so notify the parties. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/23/2019) (rro) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument on the defendants' motions to dismiss the consolidated class action complaint. addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from John E. Schreiber dated July 22, 2019. Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb.(Schreiber, John) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) DECLARATION of John E. Schreiber in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript, #2 Exhibit B - Transcript, #3 Exhibit C - Transcript, #4 Exhibit D - Form 10-K (Excerpt), #5 Exhibit E - Form 4, #6 Exhibit F - Form 4, #7 Exhibit G - Form 4, #8 Exhibit H - Form 8-K, #9 Exhibit I - Chart)(Schreiber, John) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) JOINDER to join re: #113 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, . Document filed by Barclays Capital Inc..(Buergel, Susanna) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #100 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Robert Choi, Norman H. Brown, Jr., George W. Carmany III, Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Henry E. Lentz, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Ouma Sananikone, Martin Stanley, Liam Stewart, William H. Webb. (Schreiber, John) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Macquarie Infrastructure Management (USA) Inc.. (Paparella, Christopher) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) DECLARATION of Jesse L. Jensen in Opposition re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #105 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint.. Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jensen, Jesse) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #102 MOTION to Dismiss ., #100 MOTION to Dismiss ., #105 MOTION to Dismiss the Consolidated Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Moab Partners, L.P.. (Graziano, Salvatore) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Michael Fee on behalf of Moab Partners, L.P.. (Fee, James) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ORDER with respect to #107 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. Pursuant to my Individual Rule 4.J, I will inform the parties shall oral argument be deemed necessary. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/23/2019) (rro) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
103 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2018
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Avi Josefson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pc) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Avi Josefson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pc) (Entered: 04/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Richard D. Courtney, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liam Stewart, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jay Davis, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Hooke, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System. (Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Richard D. Courtney, Jay Davis, James Hooke, Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation, Liam Stewart. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-14978368)Document filed by City of Riviera Beach General Employees Retirement System.(Josefson, Avi) (Entered: 04/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Macquarie Infrastructure Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Municipal Employees Retirement System of Michigan is a litigant

Latest cases where Barclays Capital Inc. is a litigant