This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2022 at 06:18:38 (UTC).

City of Palm Bay v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 City of Palm Bay filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-46132

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

City of Palm Bay

Defendants

Scott Fishman

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

John Gayden, M.D.

Orlando, FL 32839

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

McKesson Corporation

Mallinckrodt PLC

Cardinal Health Inc.

Endo International plc

Insys Therapeutics, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

Perry Fine

Lynn Webster

Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals

Dr. Victor Thiagaraj Selvaraj

Charleston, WV 25311

Edge Pharmacy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robin Taylor Symons

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani

100 Se Second Street

Miami, FL 33131

Eric R. Thompson

Attorney at Gordon & Rees - Miami

100 Se Second Street

Miami, FL 33131

Sujey Scarlett Herrera

Attorney at Reed Smith - Pittsburgh Stanwix

20 Stanwix Street

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Charles C. Lifland

Attorney at O'Melveny & Meyers

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Christopher John Donegan

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane

4301 W. Boy Scout Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33607

Rachel Robbie Chewning

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane

4686 Sunbeam Road

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Daniel J. Kissane

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane

4686 Sunbeam Road

Jacksonville, FL 32257

Daniel Ari Shapiro

Attorney at Cole, Scott & Kissane

4301 W. Boy Scout Blvd.

Tampa, FL 33607

S. Amy Spencer

Attorney at Shaheen & Gordon

107 Storrs Street, P.O. Box 2703

Concord, NH 03302

Spencer Hal Silverglate

Attorney at Clarke Silverglate

9Th Floor, 799 Brickell Plaza

Miami, FL 33131

A. Brian Albritton

Attorney at Phelps Dunbar

100 S. Ashley Drive

Tampa, FL 33602

Michael S. Vitale

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Orlando

South Orange Avenue

Orlando, FL 32801

Chris Nick Kolos

Attorney at Holland & Knight

P.O. Box 1526, Ste. 2600

Orlando, FL 32802

J. Matthew Donohue

Attorney at Holland & Knight - Portland

601 Southwest Second Avenue

Portland, OR 97204

Joseph L. Franco

Attorney at Holland & Knight

601 Sw 2Nd Avenue

Portland, OR 97204

William Newton Shepherd

Attorney at Holland & Knight

222 Lakeview Avenue

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Brian M. Ercole

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius

600 Brickell Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Debbie Satyal

Attorney at Adams & Reese - Fort Lauderdale

350 East Las Olas Blvd.

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Andrew J. O'Connor

Attorney at Ropes & Gray - Boston

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

John Goran

Attorney at Hall Booth Smith

9130 South Dadeland Blvd

Miami, FL 33156

16 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

51 #1

Appendix A - List of Subdivisions

51 #35

Main Document

50 #1

Appendix A - Member Case List

50 #35

Main Document

49 #1

Appendix A - Member Case List

49 #15

Main Document

#58

(#48) Order Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Settling Distributor and Janssen Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/14/2022. (B,K) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#47

#46

1 #11

Exhibit F Part 5

1 #10

Exhibit F Part 4

1 #8

Exhibit F Part 2

1 #7

Exhibit F Part1

1 #6

Exhibit E

1 #5

Exhibit D

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Florida Subdivisions' Claims Against Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 6/13/22. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - List of Subdivisions)(P,R) (Entered: 06/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Master Stipulation & Orders Dismissing With Prejudice Florida Subdivisions' Claims against Teva and CVS Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/25/22. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Member Case List)(P,R) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Florida Subdivisions' claims against Endo and Par Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 5/4/22. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A - Member Case List)(P,R) (Entered: 05/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) Order Master Stipulation & Order Dismissing With Prejudice Plaintiff Subdivisions' Claims Against Settling Distributor and Janssen Defendants. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 3/14/2022. (B,K) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Consent Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Addison J. Meyers and adding attorney John J. Goran filed by on behalf of Edge Pharmacy. (Goran, John) (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Amended complaint Short Form against All Defendants. Filed by City of Palm Bay. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Amended complaint Short Form against All Defendants and adding new party defendant(s) Walgreen Boots Alliance, Inc.; Walmart Inc., F/K/A Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.; SpecGX LLC; Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.; Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.; Actavis Pharma, Inc.; Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.; CVS Health Corporation; Smith Drug Company. Filed by City of Palm Bay. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) of Plaintiffs' Claims Against Ibem R. Borges, M.D. Only filed by City of Palm Bay. (Weinberger, Peter) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Nunc Pro Tunc Order denying without prejudice #39 Edge Pharmacy's Motion to Dismiss Complaint, Or, in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement. Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/1/18. (P,R) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER to strike re: #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/26/2018. (JLC) ). [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Edge Pharmacy. (Meyers, Addison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ***STRICKEN PER ORDER #10 - CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Furness, Amy) Modified on 9/27/2018 (BIA). [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE to counsel Hugo L. Garcia of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA) [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE to counsel Mark S. Cheffo, Hayden A. Coleman, Steven A. Reed, Harvey Bartle, Charles C. Lifland, lngo W. Sprie, Jr., Sean Morris, J. Matthew Donohue, Joseph L. Franco, Brien T. O'Connor, Andrew J. O'Connor, and S. Amy Spencer of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (Copies mailed) (BIA) [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2804, Information emailed to MDL Panel on 09/20/2018, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Docket Sheet) (BIA) [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 9/20/2018. (Irick, Daniel) [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond re #2 Complaint by Edge Pharmacy. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Ibem R. Borges, M.D., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Edge Pharmacy, Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Perry Fine, Scott Fishman, John Gayden, M.D., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals, McKesson Corporation, Russell Portenoy, Purdue Pharma L.P., Victor Thiagaraj Selvaraj, Lynn Webster with Jury Demand filed by City of Palm Bay in Brevard County Circuit Court on 05/14/2018.(BIA) [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County Circuit Court, case number 05-2018-CA-028116 filed in State Court on 05/14/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL-77036 filed by AmerisourceBergen Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F Part1, #8 Exhibit F Part 2, #9 Exhibit F Part 3, #10 Exhibit F Part 4, #11 Exhibit F Part 5)(BIA) [Transferred from flmd on 10/5/2018.] (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Edge Pharmacy Services, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mallinckrodt Pharmaceuticals is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo International Plc is a litigant

Latest cases where Insys Therapeutics, Inc. is a litigant