This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 07:00:47 (UTC).

City of Fostoria v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 City of Fostoria filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Purdue Pharma L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-45433

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Actavis, Inc.

Perry Fine

Allergan plc

Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Russell Portenoy

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Scott Fishman

The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Purdue Pharma Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

AmerisourceBergen Corporation

7 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Alana V. Tanoury

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Vincent I. Holzhall

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Brian J. Laliberte

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson - Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Mark H. Lynch

Attorney at Covington & Burling - Washington

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Carrie E. Thiem

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Daniel J. Hyzak

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Gregory D. Brunton

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Tyler G. Tarney

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani- Columbus

41 South High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Tera N. Coleman

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

219 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Carole S. Rendon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

219 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Other Attorneys

John T. Murray

Attorney at Leslie Murray Law

316 East Water Street

Sandusky, OH 44870-2517

Alicia Wolph Roshong

Attorney at Kentris, Roshong & Coleman

2738 North Main Street

Findlay, OH 45840

Leslie O. Murray

Attorney at Leslie Murray Law

316 East Water Street

Sandusky, OH 44870

 

Court Documents

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket

1 #3

Exhibit 2 - Service Papers

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Attorney Appearance by Mark H. Lynch filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Lynch, Mark) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Notice of Withdrawal of Brian J. Laliberte filed by McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to Defendants Perry, Fine, Scott Fishman and Lynn Webster filed by City of Fostoria. (Murray, John) Modified on 12/26/2018 (P,R). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Alana Valle Tanoury and adding attorney Brian J. Laliberte filed by on behalf of McKesson Corporation. (Laliberte, Brian) (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2018, answer due 8/6/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2018, answer due 8/6/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. waiver sent on 6/5/2018, answer due 8/6/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Johnson & Johnson waiver sent on 6/5/2018, answer due 8/6/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Cardinal Health, Inc. waiver sent on 5/31/2018, answer due 7/30/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. AmerisourceBergen Corporation waiver sent on 5/24/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Cephalon, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fostoria. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2018, answer due 7/23/2018 filed on behalf of City of Fostoria (Murray, John) (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder (non-document) of dismissal without prejudice of Defendant Russell Portenoy (related document #4 ). Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 5/29/18. (P,R) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) as to Defendant Russell Portenoy filed by City of Fostoria. (Murray, John) Modified on 5/29/2018 (P,R). (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Attorney Appearance by Leslie O. Murray filed by on behalf of City of Fostoria. (Murray, Leslie) (Entered: 04/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Seneca County, Ohio Court of Common Pleas, case number 18 CV 0066 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8654693. Filer has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action 1:17-md-02804. Filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - MDL Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit 2 - Service Papers, #4 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket) (Rendon, Carole) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant