This case was last updated from PACER on 09/25/2018 at 07:21:46 (UTC).

CITY HOSPITAL et al v. AZAR, II

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 CITY HOSPITAL filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against AZAR, II. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01754

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL

CITY HOSPITAL

Defendant

ALEX M. AZAR, II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth R. Marcus

Attorney at HONIGMAN MILLER SCHWARTZ AND COHN LLP

660 Woodward Avenue, 2290 First National Building

Detroit, MI 48226

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/6/2018 (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08-07-2018. (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/7/2018. (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#6

(#6) ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) Modified on 8/2/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

6 #1

Notice and Consent

7 #1

Notice and Consent

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE For Secretary of HHS, Attorney General and US Attorney re #1 Complaint, filed by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney)(Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

1 #5

Summons United States Attorney

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADVERSE FINAL AGENCY DECISION ON MEDICARE PAYMENT against ALEX M. AZAR, II (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons Attorney General of the United States, #5 Summons United States Attorney)(Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

5 #2

Summons US Attorney

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Summons Attorney General of the United States

1 #3

Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services

1 #2

Exhibit 1

5 #1

Summons Attorney General

4 #1

Exhibit 1

#4

(#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/01/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEX M. AZAR, II served on 8/6/2018 (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 08-07-2018. (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/8/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/7/2018. (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re #6 Summons Issued Electronically as to AUSA was entered in error, Duplicate to #7 . (zrdj) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ENTERED IN ERROR.....SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) Modified on 8/2/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ALEX M. AZAR, II, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmd) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE For Secretary of HHS, Attorney General and US Attorney re #1 Complaint, filed by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Summons Attorney General, #2 Summons US Attorney)(Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER: The parties are directed to read the attached Standing Order Governing Civil Cases Before Judge Emmet G. Sullivan in its entirety upon receipt. The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives in the attached Standing Order. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 08/01/18. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit 1) (mac) (Entered: 08/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Emmet G. Sullivan. (zmd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • Filing fee received: $ 400, receipt number: 4616093853. (zmd) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. Case related to Case No. 18-0958. (Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR JUDICIAL REVIEW OF ADVERSE FINAL AGENCY DECISION ON MEDICARE PAYMENT against ALEX M. AZAR, II (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by CITY HOSPITAL, WEST VIRGINIA UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons Secretary of Health and Human Services, #4 Summons Attorney General of the United States, #5 Summons United States Attorney)(Marcus, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.