This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2018 at 05:09:25 (UTC).

Cisco Systems Capital Corporation v. Eclipse Aerospace, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2018 Cisco Systems Capital Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Eclipse Aerospace, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan van Keulen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-03053

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan van Keulen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cisco Systems Capital Corporation

Defendant

Eclipse Aerospace, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas A. Burg

Attorney at Bialson, Bergen & Schwab

633 Menlo Avenue, Suite 300

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Eclipse Aerospace, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE by Cisco Systems Capital Corporation re #1 Complaint, Certificate of Interested Entities (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for 1. Breach of Contract; 2. Quantum Valebant (Common Count); 3. Account Stated (Common Count); 4. Open Book Account (Common Count); 5. Possession of Personal Property Under Security Agreement against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12377310.). Filed byCisco Systems Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Eclipse Aerospace, Inc.. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/14/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/21/2018 09:30 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 6, 4th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan van Keulen. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/6/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE by Cisco Systems Capital Corporation re #1 Complaint, Certificate of Interested Entities (Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for 1. Breach of Contract; 2. Quantum Valebant (Common Count); 3. Account Stated (Common Count); 4. Open Book Account (Common Count); 5. Possession of Personal Property Under Security Agreement against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12377310.). Filed byCisco Systems Capital Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burg, Thomas) (Filed on 5/23/2018) (Entered: 05/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cisco Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas A. Burg