This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/12/2019 at 07:01:04 (UTC).

Cipolla et al v. Team Enterprises, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2018 Cipolla filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Team Enterprises, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Laurel Beeler and William Alsup. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-06867

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Laurel Beeler

William Alsup

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alexis Wood

Felicia Cipolla

Defendants

New Team LLC

Team Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward Joseph Wynne

Attorney at Wynne Law Firm

80 E. Sir Francis Drake Blvd., Suite 3G

Larkspur, CA 94939

Bryan J. McCormack

Attorney at McCormack & Erlich, LLP

150 Post Street, Suite 742

San Francisco, CA 94108

George Ryan Nemiroff

Attorney at Wynne Law Firm

80 E. Sir Francis Drake Blvd, Suite 3G

Larkspur, CA 94939

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#12

12 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#14

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE AND ORDER RE PUTATIVE CLASS ACTIONS AND FACTORS TO BE EVALUATED FOR ANY PROPOSED CLASS SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on 12/12/2018. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2018) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • (#13) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING CMC ON REASSIGNMENT: Case Management Statement due by 2/7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tlhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2018) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 11/28/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/28/2018) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • (#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by George Ryan Nemiroff (Nemiroff, George) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Felicia Cipolla, Alexis Wood.. (McCormack, Bryan) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Felicia Cipolla, Alexis Wood.. (McCormack, Bryan) (Filed on 11/27/2018) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to New Team LLC. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 2/ 7/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2019 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (fabS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2018) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan J. McCormack (McCormack, Bryan) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • (#4) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/27/2018. (srnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Proposed Summons. (Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ERRONEOUSLY E-FILED, DISREGARD - SEE DOC #3 Proposed Summons. (Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 11/13/2018) Modified on 11/15/2018 (fabS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against New Team LLC, Team Enterprises, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12842985.). Filed byFelicia Cipolla, Alexis Wood. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wynne, Edward) (Filed on 11/13/2018) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEAM ENTERPRISES is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bryan J. McCormack

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward Joseph Wynne