This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/25/2019 at 07:34:00 (UTC).

Chumley v. Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank

Case Summary

On 11/26/2018 Chumley filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Commercial Bank, Inc Division of Commercial Bank. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Claria Horn Boom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00299

  • Filing Date:

    11/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claria Horn Boom

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kelly Chumley

Defendant

Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephanie A. Trantham

Attorney at Gambrel & Wilder - Pineville

115 W. Virginia Ave.

Pineville, KY 40977

John M. Gambrel

Attorney at Gambrel & Wilder - Pineville

115 W. Virginia Ave.

Pineville, KY 40977

Defendant Attorneys

Thomas C. Fenton

Attorney at Morgan & Pottinger, P.S.C. - Louisville

401 S. Fourth Street, Suite 1200

Louisville, KY 40202

Zachary Hunter Brown

Attorney at Brown & Hill

1005 S. Main Street, Suite 101

Corbin, KY 40701-1388

Robert L. Brown, III

Attorney at Robert L. Brown, III, Attorney at Law

1005 S. Main Street, Suite 101

Corbin, KY 40701

 

Court Documents

9 #1

consent

#9

(#9) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1.Parties shall meet w/I 21 days pursuant to FedRCivP 26(f). 2. W/I 14 days, counsel file a written joint report advising the Court as to the following: a-o. 3. Any party required, that has not done so, shall file a 7.1 disclosure statement. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/18/19. (Attachments: #1 consent)(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank.(Fenton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#7

(#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank identifying Corporate Parent Commercial Bancgroup, Inc., Other Affiliate Unified Shares, LLC, Other Affiliate Robertson Holding Company, LP for Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank.. (Fenton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank. (Fenton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit - Certified mailing return receipt

5 #1

Exhibit - Page 2 of Summons

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kelly Chumley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Page 2 of Summons , #2 Exhibit - Certified mailing return receipt )(Trantham, Stephanie) Modified on 1/16/2019 (RBB). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (RC) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4221973), filed by Kelly Chumley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(RC) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • Attorney Update. Attorney Robert L. Brown,Zachary Hunter Brown for Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank added. (CBD) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: 1.Parties shall meet w/I 21 days pursuant to FedRCivP 26(f). 2. W/I 14 days, counsel file a written joint report advising the Court as to the following: a-o. 3. Any party required, that has not done so, shall file a 7.1 disclosure statement. Signed by Judge Claria Horn Boom on 1/18/19. (Attachments: #1 consent)(SYD)cc: COR (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank.(Fenton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank identifying Corporate Parent Commercial Bancgroup, Inc., Other Affiliate Unified Shares, LLC, Other Affiliate Robertson Holding Company, LP for Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank.. (Fenton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank. (Fenton, Thomas) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO Stephanie Trantham re #5 Certificate of Service. Error: attachments were insufficiently described as Exhibit. Entry by attorney; Correction: the Clerk renamed the attachments.Attachments must be adequately described. Example: Exhibit A (incorrect);Exhibit A Affidavit of John Doe (correct). No further action required bycounsel. cc: COR (RBB) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kelly Chumley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Page 2 of Summons , #2 Exhibit - Certified mailing return receipt )(Trantham, Stephanie) Modified on 1/16/2019 (RBB). (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ACTION BY CLERK STRIKING A DOCUMENT FROM THE RECORD re #4 Summons Returned Executed was an INCOMPLETE PDF document filed as main document; Attorney shall re-file the corrected Summons Returned Executed within seven (7) calendar days. *CD* cc: COR (RBB) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STRICKEN FROM DOCKET: INCOMPLETE DOCUMENT PURSUANT to Motice of Action Striking Document filed on 1/11/2019. (RBB). (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Commercial Bank, Inc. Division of Commercial Bank; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (RC) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (RC) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4221973), filed by Kelly Chumley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(RC) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas C. Fenton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert L. Brown