This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2018 at 07:03:19 (UTC).

Christine Sawicky v. AMC Networks Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 Christine Sawicky filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against AMC Networks Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Manuel L. Real and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00114

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Manuel L. Real

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christine Sawicky

Los Angeles, CA 90041

Defendants

Shane Sparks

Drew Brown

WETV

AMC Networks Inc.

Tiffany Gaines

Edward Patino

Curtis Young

Does 1 through 10, inclusive

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants AMC Networks Inc., Drew Brown, Tiffany Gaines, Edward Patino, Shane Sparks, WETV, Curtis Young.Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

#15

(#15) 21-Day Summons Issued re Amended Complaint #14 as to Defendant AMC Networks Inc. (gk) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 was docket in error. Please disregard. Should be docket under 5:18-cv-00114-JAK (SHKx). (et) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: denying #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

1 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re: REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support, #2 . The Court therefore directs Plaintiff to submit a supplemental statement explaining in more detail her employment, income, expenses, assets, liabilities, and overall personal financial situation. Plaintiffs supplemental statement will be due by February 2. After that, the Court will evaluate the IFP request. (mz) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#14

(#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants AMC Networks Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive; Party Edward Patino, Shane Sparks, WETV, Curtis Young, Drew Brown and Tiffany Gaines terminated; amending Complaint #1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (gk) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#10

(#10) STATEMENT Re: IFP filed by Plaintiff Christine Sawicky. Re: REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #2 . (vm) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) 21-Day Summons Issued re Amended Complaint #14 as to Defendant AMC Networks Inc. (gk) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants AMC Networks Inc. and Does 1 through 10, inclusive; Party Edward Patino, Shane Sparks, WETV, Curtis Young, Drew Brown and Tiffany Gaines terminated; amending Complaint #1 ; with Jury Demand filed by Plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (gk) (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) FINANCIAL ENTRY: Received $400.00 into the registry of the Court from Christine Sawicky. Re: Order on Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60) #12 , Complaint - (Discovery), #1 . Receipt number LA166764. (edr) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER by Judge Manuel L. Real: denying #2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff SHALL PAY THE FILING FEES IN FULL within 30 days or this case will be dismissed. (mrgo) (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL upon filing of the complaint by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY - FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (cch) (Entered: 01/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • RECOMMENDATION issued by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. Proposed Order forwarded to the District Judge for approval. Re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #2 . (vm) (Entered: 01/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STATEMENT Re: IFP filed by Plaintiff Christine Sawicky. Re: REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #2 . (vm) (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 was docket in error. Please disregard. Should be docket under 5:18-cv-00114-JAK (SHKx). (et) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. (et) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner, re: REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support, #2 . The Court therefore directs Plaintiff to submit a supplemental statement explaining in more detail her employment, income, expenses, assets, liabilities, and overall personal financial situation. Plaintiffs supplemental statement will be due by February 2. After that, the Court will evaluate the IFP request. (mz) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Manuel L. Real and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Defendants AMC Networks Inc., Drew Brown, Tiffany Gaines, Edward Patino, Shane Sparks, WETV, Curtis Young.Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Christine Sawicky. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (ghap) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.