Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 14:14:16 (UTC).

Chriss Street et al v. Marriott International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/20/2018 Chriss Street filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Marriott International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is George Jarrod Hazel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-02533

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George Jarrod Hazel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Victoria Street

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Chriss Street

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendants

RHP Property NH, LLC

Marriot International, Inc.

Does 1 to 25

RHP Property NH, LLC doing business as Gaylord National Resort and Convention Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley C Fisher

Attorney at Ferguson, Schetelich & Ballew, P.C.

100 S. Charles St., Suite 1401

Baltimore, MD 21201

Robert Lawrence Ferguson, Jr

Attorney at Ferguson Schetelich and Ballew PA

1401 Bank Of America Ctr, 100 S Charles St Ste 1401

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/28/2018. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/16/2018. (c/m 10/16/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley C Fisher on behalf of Marriot International, Inc., RHP Property NH, LLC (Fisher, Ashley) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

19 #1

Envelope

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Intent to Proceed Pro Se by Chriss Street and Victoria Street. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to Complaint by Marriot International, Inc., RHP Property NH, LLC.(Ferguson, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#17

(#17) Corrected NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendants Marriott International, Inc. and RHP Property NH, LLC (Ferguson, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendants Marriott International, Inc. and RHP Property NH, LLC (Ferguson, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#15

(#15) Transfer Notification Letter (c/m to all parties and counsel 08/21/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#14

(#14) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:18-cv-01032. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 AND CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER, identifying Chriss Street; Victoria Street; Marriott International, Inc.; RHP Property NH, LLC; RHP Hotels, LLC; RHP Hotel Properties, LP; RHP Partner, LLC; and Ryman Hospitality Properties, Inc.. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-00977144 Receipt No: 0973-21910378 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Benjamin R Trachtman added to party MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin R Trachtman added to party RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER(pty:dft))(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/28/2018. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 10/16/2018. (c/m 10/16/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Ashley C Fisher on behalf of Marriot International, Inc., RHP Property NH, LLC (Fisher, Ashley) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Intent to Proceed Pro Se by Chriss Street and Victoria Street. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to Complaint by Marriot International, Inc., RHP Property NH, LLC.(Ferguson, Robert) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Corrected NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendants Marriott International, Inc. and RHP Property NH, LLC (Ferguson, Robert) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE to Substitute Attorney for Defendants Marriott International, Inc. and RHP Property NH, LLC (Ferguson, Robert) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Transfer Notification Letter (c/m to all parties and counsel 08/21/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 8:18-cv-01032. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: granting #8 MOTION to Transfer for Improper Venue Pursuant to 28 USC 1406(a). (MD JS-6. Case Terminated) (twdb) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., RHP Property NH, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration In Support of Reply to Opposition)(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) OPPOSITION IN OPPOSITION re: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue #8 filed by Plaintiffs Chriss Street, Victoria Street. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Attorney Thomas R O'Connor added to party Chriss Street(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas R O'Connor added to party Victoria Street(pty:pla))(O'Connor, Thomas) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Improper Venue filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., RHP Property NH, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/13/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration In Support of Motion, #3 Declaration In Support of Motion, #4 Declaration In Support of Motion) (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DECLARATION of David S. Doorbar CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF STAY OF PROCEEDINGS RE REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendants Marriott International, Inc., RHP Property NH, LLC. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to RHP Property NH, LLC answer now due 7/12/2018; Marriott International, Inc. answer now due 7/12/2018, filed by Defendants RHP Property NH, LLC; Marriott International, Inc..(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Chriss Street, Victoria Street in Orange County Superior on March 2, 2018, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 06/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC. PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 AND CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER, identifying Chriss Street; Victoria Street; Marriott International, Inc.; RHP Property NH, LLC; RHP Hotels, LLC; RHP Hotel Properties, LP; RHP Partner, LLC; and Ryman Hospitality Properties, Inc.. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC., RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER. (Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2018-00977144 Receipt No: 0973-21910378 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER, MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Attorney Benjamin R Trachtman added to party MARRIOTT INTERNATIONAL, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Benjamin R Trachtman added to party RHP PROPERTY NH, LLC dba GAYLORD NATIONAL RESORT & CONVENTION CENTER(pty:dft))(Trachtman, Benjamin) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant