Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 01/08/2019 at 07:59:38 (UTC).

Chris Legal Sr. v. Yolo County et al

Case Summary

On 11/09/2018 Chris Legal Sr filed an Other lawsuit against Yolo County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John A. Kronstadt and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-09542

  • Filing Date:

    11/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John A. Kronstadt

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chris Legal, Sr

5759 Columbus

Sherman Oaks, CA 91411

Defendants

Animal Services

DOES 1-5

Yolo County

Erica Vasquez

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER RE REQUEST TO RPOCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (bp) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

9 #1

proposed order

#9

(#9) EX PARTE REQUEST FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM filed by plaintiff Chris Legal, Sr. (Attachments: #1 proposed order) (lc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to 5759 Columbus, Sherman Oaks, CA 91411. Filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal, Sr. (bp) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#3

(#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal Sr. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal Sr. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

1 #1

CV-71

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal Sr. against Defendants Animal Services, Erica Vasquez, Yolo County. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER RE REQUEST TO RPOCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS #3 by Judge John A. Kronstadt: The Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby: DENIED. MD JS-6, Case Terminated. (bp) (Entered: 12/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) EX PARTE REQUEST FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM filed by plaintiff Chris Legal, Sr. (Attachments: #1 proposed order) (lc) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Change of address Changing attorneys address to 5759 Columbus, Sherman Oaks, CA 91411. Filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal, Sr. (bp) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Electronic Filing re Complaint - (Discovery) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support #3 ,Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 e-mailed to Chris Legal Sr. at chrislegal_550@yahoo.com bounced due to 5.3.0 - Other mail system problem 554-"delivery error: dd This user doesn't have a yahoo.com account (chrislegal_550@yahoo.com) [-9] - mta4192.mail.gq1.yahoo.com". Pro Se party does not have permission to e-file in this case. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the parties obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John A. Kronstadt and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal Sr. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal Sr. (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Chris Legal Sr. against Defendants Animal Services, Erica Vasquez, Yolo County. Case assigned to Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (Attachments: #1 CV-71) (jtil) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yolo County is a litigant

Latest cases where ANIMAL SERVICES is a litigant